This case was last updated from Maricopa County Justice Courts on 10/28/2019 at 10:52:07 (UTC).

TIDEWATER FINANCE COMPANY VS MICHAEL J LUKETICH Et Al

Case Summary

On 07/17/2017 TIDEWATER FINANCE COMPANY filed an Other lawsuit against MICHAEL J LUKETICH. This case was filed in Maricopa County Justice Courts, East Mesa Justice Courthouse located in Maricopa, Arizona. The Judge overseeing this case is Russell, Keith. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0348

  • Filing Date:

    07/17/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Maricopa County Justice Courts

  • Courthouse:

    East Mesa Justice Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Maricopa, Arizona

Judge Details

Judge

Russell, Keith

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

TIDEWATER FINANCE COMPANY

Defendants

MICHAEL J LUKETICH

LISA M LUKETICH

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

STANLEY HAMMERMAN

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/29/2019
  • Events: Event Type: Garnishment, Sub Type: Order of Continuing Lien, Result: Issued/Ordered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2019
  • Events: Event Type: Garnishment Creditor, Sub Type: Application for Order of Continuing Lien, Result: Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2019
  • Events: Event Type: Garnishee, Sub Type: Answer (Earnings), Result: Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2019
  • Events: Event Type: Affidavit of Service, Sub Type: Garnishment Return, Result: Served

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2019
  • Events: Event Type: Garnishee, Sub Type: Answer (Earnings), Result: Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2019
  • Events: Event Type: Writ, Sub Type: Garnishment Earnings, Result: Issued/Ordered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2019
  • Events: Event Type: Garnishment Creditor, Sub Type: Application for Writ of Garnishment, Result: Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Garnishment, Sub Type: Release & Quash Writ, Result: Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Garnishment, Sub Type: Order Discharging Garnishee, Result: Issued/Ordered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Garnishee, Sub Type: Answer (Earnings), Result: Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 09/19/2017
  • Events: Event Type: Counsel, Sub Type: Affidavit in Support of Attorney Fees, Result: Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2017
  • Events: Event Type: Statement of Costs, Result: Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2017
  • Events: Event Type: Request, Sub Type: Affidavit for Entry of Default Judgment, Result: Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2017
  • Events: Event Type: Proof of Debt, Result: Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2017
  • Events: Event Type: Application for Entry of Default, Result: Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2017
  • Events: Event Type: Affidavit of Service, Sub Type: Private Process, Result: Served

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2017
  • Events: Event Type: Proof of Debt, Result: Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2017
  • Judgment For: TIDEWATER FINANCE COMPANY Judgment Against: LISA M LUKETICH Judgment Against: MICHAEL J LUKETICH, Amount: $7,407.63, Type: Principal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2017
  • Judgment For: TIDEWATER FINANCE COMPANY Judgment Against: LISA M LUKETICH Judgment Against: MICHAEL J LUKETICH, Amount: $750.00, Type: Attorney Fee

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2017
  • Judgment For: TIDEWATER FINANCE COMPANY Judgment Against: LISA M LUKETICH Judgment Against: MICHAEL J LUKETICH, Amount: $151.00, Type: Costs

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.