This case was last updated from Maricopa County Justice Courts on 10/31/2019 at 12:46:07 (UTC).

THE HERTZ CORPORATION VS REID SCHMITT

Case Summary

On 11/22/2017 THE HERTZ CORPORATION filed an Other lawsuit against REID SCHMITT. This case was filed in Maricopa County Justice Courts, Dreamy Draw Justice Courthouse located in Maricopa, Arizona. The Judge overseeing this case is Conti, Frank. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********2689

  • Filing Date:

    11/22/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Maricopa County Justice Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Dreamy Draw Justice Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Maricopa, Arizona

Judge Details

Judge

Conti, Frank

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

THE HERTZ CORPORATION

Defendant

REID SCHMITT

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Jon Sales

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/27/2019
  • Events: Event Type: Satisfaction Of Judgment, Result: Filed by Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2019
  • Events: Event Type: Garnishment, Sub Type: Order Discharging Garnishee, Result: Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2019
  • Events: Event Type: Garnishment Creditor, Sub Type: Petition Discharging Garnishee, Result: Filed by Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2019
  • Events: Event Type: Garnishment, Sub Type: Order of Continuing Lien, Result: Issued/Ordered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2019
  • Events: Event Type: Garnishment Creditor, Sub Type: Application for Order of Continuing Lien, Result: Filed by Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Garnishee, Sub Type: Answer (Earnings), Result: Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Affidavit of Service, Sub Type: Garnishment Return, Result: Served

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Garnishment Creditor, Sub Type: Application for Writ of Garnishment, Result: Filed by Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Judgment, Sub Type: Default, Result: Issued/Ordered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Request, Sub Type: Affidavit for Entry of Default Judgment, Result: Filed by Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Application for Entry of Default, Result: Filed by Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Affidavit of Service, Sub Type: Publication, Result: Served

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Affidavit of Service, Sub Type: Publication, Result: Served

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Order, Sub Type: Extend Time for Service, Result: Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Motion, Sub Type: Extension of Time to Serve, Result: Filed by Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Notice, Sub Type: Dismissal for Lack of Service, Result: Mailed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2018
  • Judgment For: THE HERTZ CORPORATION Judgment Against: REID SCHMITT, Amount: $8,751.44, Type: Principal, Status: Satisfied

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2018
  • Judgment For: THE HERTZ CORPORATION Judgment Against: REID SCHMITT, Amount: $324.00, Type: Costs, Status: Satisfied

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2018
  • Judgment For: THE HERTZ CORPORATION Judgment Against: REID SCHMITT, Amount: $500.00, Type: Attorney Fee, Status: Satisfied

    Read MoreRead Less