This case was last updated from Maricopa County Justice Courts on 11/05/2019 at 06:44:05 (UTC).

TD BANK USA, N.A. VS JOSEPH A TOWNE

Case Summary

On 02/12/2018 TD BANK USA, N A filed an Other lawsuit against JOSEPH A TOWNE. This case was filed in Maricopa County Justice Courts, Desert Ridge Justice Courthouse located in Maricopa, Arizona. The Judge overseeing this case is Riggs, Cathy. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********8662

  • Filing Date:

    02/12/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Maricopa County Justice Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Desert Ridge Justice Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Maricopa, Arizona

Judge Details

Judge

Riggs, Cathy

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

TD BANK USA, N.A.

Defendant

JOSEPH A TOWNE

Garnishees

AutoNation Chrysler

Fiat North Phoenix

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Kristopher Childers

Ryan Johnson

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/28/2019
  • Events: Event Type: Garnishee, Sub Type: Answer (Earnings), Result: Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2019
  • Events: Event Type: Affidavit of Service, Sub Type: Private Process, Result: Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2019
  • Events: Event Type: Writ, Sub Type: Garnishment Earnings, Result: Issued/Ordered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2019
  • Events: Event Type: Judgment, Sub Type: Default, Result: Signed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2019
  • Events: Event Type: Statement of Costs, Result: Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2019
  • Events: Event Type: Notice, Sub Type: Pending Dismissal of Lawsuit, Result: Mailed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/24/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Application for Entry of Default, Result: Filed by Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Counsel, Sub Type: Notice of Substitution, Result: Filed by Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Affidavit of Service, Sub Type: Post/Mail, Result: Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Motion, Sub Type: Alternative Service, Result: Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Motion, Sub Type: Extension of Time to Serve, Result: Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2019
  • Judgment For: TD BANK USA, N.A. Judgment Against: JOSEPH A TOWNE, Amount: $1,409.15, Type: Principal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2019
  • Judgment For: TD BANK USA, N.A. Judgment Against: JOSEPH A TOWNE, Amount: $169.00, Type: Costs

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.