This case was last updated from Maricopa County Justice Courts on 07/31/2018 at 10:33:39 (UTC).

SYNCHRONY BANK VS TIFFANY NAVARRO

Case Summary

On 04/05/2018 SYNCHRONY BANK filed an Other lawsuit against TIFFANY NAVARRO. This case was filed in Maricopa County Justice Courts, Manistee Justice Court located in Maricopa, Arizona. The Judge overseeing this case is Watts, Donald. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0111

  • Filing Date:

    04/05/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Maricopa, Arizona

Judge Details

Judge

Watts, Donald

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SYNCHRONY BANK

Defendant

TIFFANY NAVARRO

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Kristopher Childers

Defendant Attorney

Mark Yonan

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/25/2018
  • DocketEvents: Event Type: Judgment, Sub Type: Stipulated, Result: Signed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/22/2018
  • DocketEvents: Event Type: Affidavit of Service, Sub Type: Private Process, Result: Served

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/23/2018
  • DocketEvents: Event Type: Stipulation and Order of Judgment, Result: Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/12/2018
  • DocketEvents: Event Type: Pre-Trial Conference Report, Result: Completed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/11/2018
  • DocketEvents: Event Type: Order, Sub Type: Appear Telephonically, Result: Granted

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/22/2018
  • DocketEvents: Event Type: Disclosure Statement, Sub Type: Service Re 26.1 Disclosure, Result: Filed by Plaintiff

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/22/2018
  • DocketEvents: Event Type: Motion, Sub Type: Appear Telephonically, Result: Filed by Plaintiff

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/22/2018
  • DocketEvents: Event Type: Notice, Sub Type: Comprehensive Pre Trial Conf Hearing, Result: Mailed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/18/2018
  • DocketEvents: Event Type: Answer, Sub Type: Civil Complaint, Result: Filed by Defendant

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/18/2018
  • DocketEvents: Event Type: Counsel, Sub Type: Notice of Appearance, Result: Filed by Defendant

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/25/2018
  • DocketJudgment For: SYNCHRONY BANK Judgment Against: TIFFANY NAVARRO, Amount: $1,439.47, Type: Principal

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/25/2018
  • DocketJudgment For: SYNCHRONY BANK Judgment Against: TIFFANY NAVARRO, Amount: $169.00, Type: Costs

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less