This case was last updated from Maricopa County Justice Courts on 10/20/2019 at 23:07:23 (UTC).

SYNCHRONY BANK VS JULIE HUGHES

Case Summary

On 04/13/2017 SYNCHRONY BANK filed an Other lawsuit against JULIE HUGHES. This case was filed in Maricopa County Justice Courts, Downtown Justice Courthouse located in Maricopa, Arizona. The Judges overseeing this case are Hernandez, Jimmie and Medina, Enrique. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********7221

  • Filing Date:

    04/13/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Maricopa County Justice Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Downtown Justice Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Maricopa, Arizona

Judge Details

Judges

Hernandez, Jimmie

Medina, Enrique

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SYNCHRONY BANK

Defendant

JULIE HUGHES

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Kristopher Childers

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/29/2019
  • Events: Event Type: Notice, Sub Type: Suspending Action Due to Bankruptcy, Result: Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Order, Sub Type: Undesignated, Result: Action Stayed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Corrective Action Notice Sent, Result: Mailed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Notice, Sub Type: Dismissal, Result: Moot

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Notice, Sub Type: Filing of Bankruptcy, Result: Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2017
  • Events: Event Type: Judgment, Sub Type: Default, Result: Default Judgment And Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2017
  • Events: Event Type: Counsel, Sub Type: Statement of Costs, Result: Filed by Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2017
  • Events: Event Type: Request, Sub Type: Affidavit for Entry of Default Judgment, Result: Filed by Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2017
  • Events: Event Type: Application for Entry of Default, Result: Filed by Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2017
  • Events: Event Type: Affidavit of Service, Sub Type: Private Process, Result: Served

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2017
  • Events: Event Type: Notice, Sub Type: Dismissal for Lack of Service, Result: Mailed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2017
  • Judgment For: SYNCHRONY BANK Judgment Against: JULIE HUGHES, Amount: $3,004.06, Type: Principal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2017
  • Judgment For: SYNCHRONY BANK Judgment Against: JULIE HUGHES, Amount: $166.00, Type: Costs

    Read MoreRead Less