This case was last updated from Maricopa County Justice Courts on 10/18/2019 at 23:23:46 (UTC).

SWIFT TRANSPORTATION COMPANY VS Micheal Ragan

Case Summary

On 01/25/2017 SWIFT TRANSPORTATION COMPANY filed an Other lawsuit against Micheal Ragan. This case was filed in Maricopa County Justice Courts, Encanto Justice Courthouse located in Maricopa, Arizona. The Judges overseeing this case are McMurry, C. Steven and Cheuvront, Ken. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********7333

  • Filing Date:

    01/25/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Maricopa County Justice Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Encanto Justice Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Maricopa, Arizona

Judge Details

Judges

McMurry, C. Steven

Cheuvront, Ken

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SWIFT TRANSPORTATION COMPANY

Defendant

Micheal Ragan

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Jared Buchanan

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/09/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Satisfaction Of Judgment, Result: Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Garnishment Creditor, Sub Type: Petition Discharging Garnishee, Result: Signed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Garnishment Creditor, Sub Type: Application for Order of Continuing Lien, Result: Signed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Affidavit of Service, Sub Type: Garnishment Return, Result: Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Garnishee, Sub Type: Answer, Result: Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2017
  • Events: Event Type: Accounting, Sub Type: Void, Result: Completed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2017
  • Events: Event Type: Garnishment Creditor, Sub Type: Application for Writ of Garnishment, Result: Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2017
  • Events: Event Type: Judgment, Sub Type: Default, Result: Signed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2017
  • Events: Event Type: Request, Sub Type: Affidavit for Entry of Default Judgment, Result: Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2017
  • Events: Event Type: Application for Entry of Default, Result: Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2017
  • Events: Event Type: Affidavit of Service, Sub Type: Private Process, Result: Served

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2017
  • Judgment For: SWIFT TRANSPORTATION COMPANY Judgment Against: Micheal Ragan, Amount: $3,900.00, Type: Principal, Status: Satisfied

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2017
  • Judgment For: SWIFT TRANSPORTATION COMPANY Judgment Against: Micheal Ragan, Amount: $216.00, Type: Costs, Status: Satisfied

    Read MoreRead Less