This case was last updated from Maricopa County Justice Courts on 10/29/2019 at 10:05:37 (UTC).

Sun Harbor Community Assoc VS Steven DeSantiago

Case Summary

On 08/28/2017 Sun Harbor Community Assoc filed an Other lawsuit against Steven DeSantiago. This case was filed in Maricopa County Justice Courts, Agua Fria Justice Courthouse located in Maricopa, Arizona. The Judges overseeing this case are Wismer, Craig and Guzman, Joe. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0229

  • Filing Date:

    08/28/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Maricopa County Justice Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Agua Fria Justice Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Maricopa, Arizona

Judge Details

Judges

Wismer, Craig

Guzman, Joe

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Sun Harbor Community Assoc

Defendant

Steven DeSantiago

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Beth Mulcahy

Defendant Attorney

Helen Santilli

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/09/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Notice, Sub Type: Suspending Action Due to Bankruptcy, Result: Mailed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Notice, Sub Type: Filing of Bankruptcy, Result: Filed by Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2017
  • Events: Event Type: Judgment, Sub Type: Default, Result: Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2017
  • Events: Event Type: Order of Transfer Out, Result: Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2017
  • Events: Event Type: Document Received, Sub Type: Undesignated, Result: Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2017
  • Events: Event Type: Affidavit in Support of Attorney Fees, Result: Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2017
  • Events: Event Type: Request, Sub Type: Affidavit for Entry of Default Judgment, Result: Default Judgment And Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2017
  • Events: Event Type: Document Received, Sub Type: Undesignated, Result: Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2017
  • Events: Event Type: Application for Entry of Default, Result: Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2017
  • Events: Event Type: Affidavit of Service, Sub Type: Private Process, Result: Summons Returned Served

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2017
  • Judgment For: Sun Harbor Community Assoc Judgment Against: Steven DeSantiago, Amount: $1,140.00, Type: Principal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2017
  • Judgment For: Sun Harbor Community Assoc Judgment Against: Steven DeSantiago, Amount: $29.51, Type: Interest

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2017
  • Judgment For: Sun Harbor Community Assoc Judgment Against: Steven DeSantiago, Amount: $1,893.01, Type: Attorney Fee

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2017
  • Judgment For: Sun Harbor Community Assoc Judgment Against: Steven DeSantiago, Amount: $165.70, Type: Costs

    Read MoreRead Less