Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Maricopa County Justice Courts on 04/11/2021 at 14:08:15 (UTC).

STONEGATES ESTATES HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION VS RICHARDO D ORQUIZ Et Al

Case Summary

On 05/28/2020 STONEGATES ESTATES HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION filed an Other lawsuit against RICHARDO D ORQUIZ. This case was filed in Maricopa County Justice Courts, East Mesa Justice Courthouse located in Maricopa, Arizona. The Judge overseeing this case is Russell, Keith. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********7324

  • Filing Date:

    05/28/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Maricopa County Justice Courts

  • Courthouse:

    East Mesa Justice Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Maricopa, Arizona

Judge Details

Judge

Russell, Keith

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STONEGATES ESTATES HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION

Defendants

RICHARDO D ORQUIZ

VANESSA R ORQUIZ

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Jeffrey Corben

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/09/2020
  • HearingEvents: Event Type: Judgment, Sub Type: Stipulated, Result: Judgment Entered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2020
  • JudgementJudgment For: STONEGATES ESTATES HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION Judgment Against: RICHARDO D ORQUIZ Judgment Against: VANESSA R ORQUIZ, Amount: $1,977.50, Type: Principal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2020
  • JudgementJudgment For: STONEGATES ESTATES HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION Judgment Against: RICHARDO D ORQUIZ Judgment Against: VANESSA R ORQUIZ, Amount: $1,112.50, Type: Attorney Fee

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2020
  • JudgementJudgment For: STONEGATES ESTATES HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION Judgment Against: RICHARDO D ORQUIZ Judgment Against: VANESSA R ORQUIZ, Amount: $191.00, Type: Costs

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2020
  • HearingEvents: Event Type: Stipulation and Order of Judgment, Result: Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2020
  • HearingEvents: Event Type: Application for Entry of Default, Result: Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2020
  • HearingEvents: Event Type: Affidavit of Service, Sub Type: Private Process, Result: Served

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2020
  • HearingEvents: Event Type: Proof of Debt, Result: Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2020
  • HearingEvents: Event Type: Summons, Sub Type: Issued, Result: Issued/Ordered

    Read MoreRead Less