This case was last updated from Maricopa County Justice Courts on 02/19/2020 at 11:46:14 (UTC).

STEVENSON CATHERINE/ BROWN-STEVENSEN ELI VS ALEXIS MANORE

Case Summary

On 12/04/2019 STEVENSON CATHERINE/ BROWN-STEVENSEN ELI filed an Other lawsuit against ALEXIS MANORE. This case was filed in Maricopa County Justice Courts, University Lakes Justice Courthouse located in Maricopa, Arizona. The Judge overseeing this case is Kissell, Tyler. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********4987

  • Filing Date:

    12/04/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Maricopa County Justice Courts

  • Courthouse:

    University Lakes Justice Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Maricopa, Arizona

Judge Details

Judge

Kissell, Tyler

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STEVENSON CATHERINE/ BROWN-STEVENSEN ELI

Defendant

ALEXIS MANORE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Scott Clark

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/03/2020
  • HearingEvents: Event Type: Writ, Sub Type: Restitution, Result: Served

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2019
  • HearingEvents: Event Type: Writ, Sub Type: Restitution, Result: Issued/Ordered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2019
  • HearingEvents: Event Type: Imaged Case File, Result: Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2019
  • HearingEvents: Event Type: Judgment, Sub Type: Default, Result: Signed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2019
  • Judgment For: STEVENSON CATHERINE/ BROWN-STEVENSEN ELI Judgment Against: ALEXIS MANORE, Amount: $2,300.00, Type: Rent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2019
  • Judgment For: STEVENSON CATHERINE/ BROWN-STEVENSEN ELI Judgment Against: ALEXIS MANORE, Amount: $300.00, Type: Late Charge

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2019
  • Judgment For: STEVENSON CATHERINE/ BROWN-STEVENSEN ELI Judgment Against: ALEXIS MANORE, Amount: $50.00, Type: Undesignated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2019
  • Judgment For: STEVENSON CATHERINE/ BROWN-STEVENSEN ELI Judgment Against: ALEXIS MANORE, Amount: $98.00, Type: Costs

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2019
  • Judgment For: STEVENSON CATHERINE/ BROWN-STEVENSEN ELI Judgment Against: ALEXIS MANORE, Amount: $90.00, Type: Attorney Fee

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.