This case was last updated from Maricopa County Justice Courts on 10/19/2019 at 04:25:21 (UTC).

Steven Brocious VS PENSRI BALKISSOON

Case Summary

On 02/02/2017 Steven Brocious filed an Other lawsuit against PENSRI BALKISSOON. This case was filed in Maricopa County Justice Courts, Encanto Justice Courthouse located in Maricopa, Arizona. The Judges overseeing this case are McMurry, C. Steven and Cheuvront, Ken. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********2753

  • Filing Date:

    02/02/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Maricopa County Justice Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Encanto Justice Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Maricopa, Arizona

Judge Details

Judges

McMurry, C. Steven

Cheuvront, Ken

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Steven Brocious

Defendant

PENSRI BALKISSOON

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

Matthew Hayes

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/07/2017
  • Events: Event Type: Letter, Result: Mailed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2017
  • Events: Event Type: Judgment, Sub Type: For Plaintiff, Result: Signed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2017
  • Events: Event Type: Telephone Call, Result: Completed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2017
  • Events: Event Type: Telephone Call, Result: Received

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2017
  • Events: Event Type: Notice, Sub Type: Change of Address, Result: Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2017
  • Events: Event Type: Notice, Sub Type: Court Date, Result: Hearing Set

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2017
  • Events: Event Type: Notice, Sub Type: Court Date, Result: Hearing Set

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2017
  • Events: Event Type: Order, Sub Type: Undesignated, Result: Mailed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2017
  • Events: Event Type: Notice, Sub Type: Court Date, Result: Hearing Set

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2017
  • Events: Event Type: Counsel, Sub Type: Notice of Appearance, Result: Filed by Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2017
  • Events: Event Type: Motion, Sub Type: Continue Trial, Result: Filed by Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2017
  • Events: Event Type: Notice, Sub Type: Trial Date, Result: Hearing Set

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2017
  • Events: Event Type: Answer, Sub Type: Eviction Action Complaint, Result: Filed by Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less