This case was last updated from Maricopa County Justice Courts on 10/20/2019 at 09:39:42 (UTC).

STATE OF ARIZONA, ex rel., THE ARIZONA DEPARTMENT OF ECONOMIC SECURITY VS TAYLER C. D. BAILEY

Case Summary

On 03/20/2017 STATE OF ARIZONA, ex rel , THE ARIZONA DEPARTMENT OF ECONOMIC SECURITY filed an Other lawsuit against TAYLER C D BAILEY. This case was filed in Maricopa County Justice Courts, Downtown Justice Courthouse located in Maricopa, Arizona. The Judges overseeing this case are Hernandez, Jimmie and Medina, Enrique. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********1763

  • Filing Date:

    03/20/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Maricopa County Justice Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Downtown Justice Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Maricopa, Arizona

Judge Details

Judges

Hernandez, Jimmie

Medina, Enrique

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STATE OF ARIZONA, ex rel., THE ARIZONA DEPARTMENT OF ECONOMIC SECURITY

Defendant

TAYLER C. D. BAILEY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

David Dlott

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/09/2017
  • Events: Event Type: Judgment, Sub Type: Default, Result: Default Judgment And Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2017
  • Events: Event Type: Request, Sub Type: Affidavit for Entry of Default Judgment, Result: Filed by Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2017
  • Events: Event Type: Counsel, Sub Type: Statement of Costs, Result: Filed by Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2017
  • Events: Event Type: Notice, Sub Type: Pending Dismissal of Lawsuit, Result: Mailed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2017
  • Events: Event Type: Minute Entry Issued, Result: Mailed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2017
  • Events: Event Type: Application for Entry of Default, Result: Filed by Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2017
  • Events: Event Type: Notice, Sub Type: Pending Dismissal of Lawsuit, Result: Mailed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2017
  • Events: Event Type: Notice, Sub Type: Dismissal for Lack of Service, Result: Mailed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2017
  • Events: Event Type: Affidavit of Service, Sub Type: Private Process, Result: Served

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2017
  • Events: Event Type: Order, Sub Type: Dismissal Without Prejudice, Result: Issued/Ordered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2017
  • Judgment For: STATE OF ARIZONA, ex rel., THE ARIZONA DEPARTMENT OF ECONOMIC SECURITY Judgment Against: TAYLER C. D. BAILEY, Amount: $1,744.55, Type: Principal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2017
  • Judgment For: STATE OF ARIZONA, ex rel., THE ARIZONA DEPARTMENT OF ECONOMIC SECURITY Judgment Against: TAYLER C. D. BAILEY, Amount: $1,362.48, Type: Principal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2017
  • Judgment For: STATE OF ARIZONA, ex rel., THE ARIZONA DEPARTMENT OF ECONOMIC SECURITY Judgment Against: TAYLER C. D. BAILEY, Amount: $45.00, Type: Costs

    Read MoreRead Less