This case was last updated from Maricopa County Justice Courts on 10/29/2019 at 13:14:50 (UTC).

STATE OF ARIZONA, ex rel., THE ARIZONA DEPARTMENT OF ECONOMIC SECURITY VS ROBERT DINSMORE KAY Et Al

Case Summary

On 08/23/2017 STATE OF ARIZONA, ex rel , THE ARIZONA DEPARTMENT OF ECONOMIC SECURITY filed an Other lawsuit against ROBERT DINSMORE KAY. This case was filed in Maricopa County Justice Courts, Downtown Justice Courthouse located in Maricopa, Arizona. The Judge overseeing this case is Medina, Enrique. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********5343

  • Filing Date:

    08/23/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Maricopa County Justice Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Downtown Justice Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Maricopa, Arizona

Judge Details

Judge

Medina, Enrique

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STATE OF ARIZONA, ex rel., THE ARIZONA DEPARTMENT OF ECONOMIC SECURITY

Defendants

ROBERT DINSMORE KAY

LEAH C. KAY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Raymond Haight

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/07/2017
  • Events: Event Type: Judgment, Sub Type: Stipulated, Result: Stipulated Judgment and Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2017
  • Events: Event Type: Stipulation and Order of Judgment, Result: Filed by Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2017
  • Events: Event Type: Notice, Sub Type: Dismissal for Lack of Service, Result: Mailed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2017
  • Judgment For: STATE OF ARIZONA, ex rel., THE ARIZONA DEPARTMENT OF ECONOMIC SECURITY Judgment Against: ROBERT DINSMORE KAY Judgment Against: LEAH C. KAY, Amount: $1,408.00, Type: Principal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2017
  • Judgment For: STATE OF ARIZONA, ex rel., THE ARIZONA DEPARTMENT OF ECONOMIC SECURITY Judgment Against: ROBERT DINSMORE KAY Judgment Against: LEAH C. KAY, Amount: $1,156.00, Type: Principal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2017
  • Judgment For: STATE OF ARIZONA, ex rel., THE ARIZONA DEPARTMENT OF ECONOMIC SECURITY Judgment Against: ROBERT DINSMORE KAY Judgment Against: LEAH C. KAY, Amount: $40.00, Type: Costs

    Read MoreRead Less