This case was last updated from Maricopa County Justice Courts on 10/26/2019 at 14:08:38 (UTC).

STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY VS MIRIAM VALERA HERNANDEZ

Case Summary

On 05/08/2017 STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY filed an Other lawsuit against MIRIAM VALERA HERNANDEZ. This case was filed in Maricopa County Justice Courts, Downtown Justice Courthouse located in Maricopa, Arizona. The Judges overseeing this case are Hernandez, Jimmie and Medina, Enrique. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********2663

  • Filing Date:

    05/08/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Maricopa County Justice Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Downtown Justice Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Maricopa, Arizona

Judge Details

Judges

Hernandez, Jimmie

Medina, Enrique

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY

Defendant

MIRIAM VALERA HERNANDEZ

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Timothy Moulton

Defendant Attorney

Lily Richardson (compton)

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/21/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Returned Mail, Sub Type: For Plaintiff, Result: Completed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Order, Sub Type: Dismissal, Result: Dismissed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Order, Sub Type: Dismissal With Prejudice, Result: Issued/Ordered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Stipulation, Sub Type: Dismiss With Prejudice, Result: Filed by Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Notice, Sub Type: Pending Dismissal of Lawsuit, Result: Mailed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Notice, Sub Type: Settlement, Result: Filed by Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Pre-Trial Conference Report, Result: Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2017
  • Events: Event Type: Pre-Trial Conference Report, Result: Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2017
  • Events: Event Type: Notice, Sub Type: Comprehensive Pre Trial Conf Hearing, Result: Mailed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2017
  • Events: Event Type: Notice, Sub Type: Comprehensive Pre Trial Conf Hearing, Result: Mailed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2017
  • Events: Event Type: Pre-Trial Conference Report, Result: Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2017
  • Events: Event Type: Counsel, Sub Type: Notice of Substitution, Result: Filed by Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2017
  • Events: Event Type: Notice, Sub Type: Comprehensive Pre Trial Conf Hearing, Result: Mailed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2017
  • Events: Event Type: Pre-Trial Conference Report, Result: Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2017
  • Events: Event Type: Counsel, Sub Type: Notice of Substitution, Result: Filed by Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2017
  • Events: Event Type: Notice, Sub Type: Comprehensive Pre Trial Conf Hearing, Result: Mailed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2017
  • Events: Event Type: Answer, Sub Type: Civil Complaint, Result: Filed by Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2017
  • Events: Event Type: Jury, Sub Type: Demand, Result: Filed by Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2017
  • Events: Event Type: Affidavit of Service, Sub Type: Private Process, Result: Served

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2017
  • Events: Event Type: Notice, Sub Type: Dismissal for Lack of Service, Result: Mailed

    Read MoreRead Less