This case was last updated from Maricopa County Justice Courts on 10/31/2019 at 23:27:19 (UTC).

STANLEY SILAS VS DAVOR BILAVER

Case Summary

On 12/13/2017 STANLEY SILAS filed an Other lawsuit against DAVOR BILAVER. This case was filed in Maricopa County Justice Courts, Highland Justice Courthouse located in Maricopa, Arizona. The Judge overseeing this case is Urie, Steve. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********5971

  • Filing Date:

    12/13/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Maricopa County Justice Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Highland Justice Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Maricopa, Arizona

Judge Details

Judge

Urie, Steve

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STANLEY SILAS

Defendant

DAVOR BILAVER

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Raymond Hunter

Stanley Silas

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/30/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Exhibit, Sub Type: Entered, Result: Filed by Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Appeal Notice of, Sub Type: Right to Appeal, Result: Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Judgment, Sub Type: For Plaintiff, Result: Judgment Entered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Subpoena duces tecum, Result: Filed by Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Ruling on Motion, Sub Type: Continue Trial, Result: Denied

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Motion, Sub Type: Continue Trial, Result: Filed by Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Ruling on Motion, Sub Type: Continue Trial, Result: Denied

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Response, Sub Type: To Motion, Result: Filed by Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Motion, Sub Type: Continue Trial, Result: Filed by Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Notice, Sub Type: Court Date, Result: Mailed

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 02/06/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Notice, Sub Type: Comprehensive Pre Trial Conf Hearing, Result: Mailed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Answer, Sub Type: Civil Complaint, Result: Filed by Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Response, Sub Type: To Motion, Result: Filed by Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Ruling on Motion, Sub Type: Undesignated, Result: Issued/Ordered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Waiver/Deferral, Sub Type: Filing Fee Due, Result: Denied

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Motion, Sub Type: Undesignated, Result: Filed by Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Waiver/Deferral, Sub Type: Application for Waiver/Deferral, Result: Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2017
  • Events: Event Type: Affidavit of Service, Sub Type: Private Process, Result: Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2018
  • Judgment For: STANLEY SILAS Judgment Against: DAVOR BILAVER, Amount: $1,840.00, Type: Principal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2018
  • Judgment For: STANLEY SILAS Judgment Against: DAVOR BILAVER, Amount: $364.40, Type: Costs

    Read MoreRead Less