This case was last updated from Maricopa County Justice Courts on 10/30/2019 at 03:37:00 (UTC).

ST LUKES MEDICAL CENTER LP VS TOMMY WORKS

Case Summary

On 09/28/2017 ST LUKES MEDICAL CENTER LP filed an Other lawsuit against TOMMY WORKS. This case was filed in Maricopa County Justice Courts, South Mountain Justice Courthouse located in Maricopa, Arizona. The Judge overseeing this case is Williams, Cody. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********2816

  • Filing Date:

    09/28/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Maricopa County Justice Courts

  • Courthouse:

    South Mountain Justice Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Maricopa, Arizona

Judge Details

Judge

Williams, Cody

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ST LUKES MEDICAL CENTER LP

Defendant

TOMMY WORKS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

David Lippman

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/04/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Garnishment Creditor, Sub Type: Release & Quash Writ, Result: Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Garnishment Creditor, Sub Type: Certificate of Service, Result: Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Garnishment Creditor, Sub Type: Application for Writ of Garnishment, Result: Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Writ, Sub Type: Garnishment Earnings, Result: Signed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Judgment, Sub Type: Default, Result: Issued/Ordered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Affidavit in Support of Attorney Fees, Result: Filed by Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Statement of Costs, Result: Filed by Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Request, Sub Type: Affidavit for Entry of Default Judgment, Result: Filed by Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2017
  • Events: Event Type: Application for Entry of Default, Result: Filed by Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2017
  • Events: Event Type: Document Received, Sub Type: Undesignated, Result: Filed by Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2017
  • Events: Event Type: Affidavit of Service, Sub Type: Private Process, Result: Served

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Order, Sub Type: Undesignated, Result: Issued/Ordered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2018
  • Judgment For: ST LUKES MEDICAL CENTER LP Judgment Against: TOMMY WORKS, Amount: $2,158.00, Type: Principal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2018
  • Judgment For: ST LUKES MEDICAL CENTER LP Judgment Against: TOMMY WORKS, Amount: $226.00, Type: Costs

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2018
  • Judgment For: ST LUKES MEDICAL CENTER LP Judgment Against: TOMMY WORKS, Amount: $500.00, Type: Attorney Fee

    Read MoreRead Less