This case was last updated from Maricopa County Justice Courts on 11/01/2019 at 07:11:26 (UTC).

SOUTHWEST FINANCE LLC VS SPENCER STEWART

Case Summary

On 12/26/2017 SOUTHWEST FINANCE LLC filed an Other lawsuit against SPENCER STEWART. This case was filed in Maricopa County Justice Courts, Agua Fria Justice Courthouse located in Maricopa, Arizona. The Judge overseeing this case is Guzman, Joe. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********5269

  • Filing Date:

    12/26/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Maricopa County Justice Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Agua Fria Justice Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Maricopa, Arizona

Judge Details

Judge

Guzman, Joe

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SOUTHWEST FINANCE LLC

Defendant

SPENCER STEWART

Garnishee

SHIFTGIG BULLPEN INC

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/01/2019
  • Events: Event Type: Garnishment Creditor, Sub Type: Application for Writ of Garnishment, Result: Filed by Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Garnishment, Sub Type: Order Discharging Garnishee, Result: Issued/Ordered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Garnishee, Sub Type: Answer (Earnings), Result: Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Garnishment Creditor, Sub Type: Application for Writ of Garnishment, Result: Filed by Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Judgment, Sub Type: Default, Result: Default Judgment And Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Proof of Debt, Result: Filed by Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Statement of Costs, Result: Filed by Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Request, Sub Type: Affidavit for Entry of Default Judgment, Result: Filed by Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Application for Entry of Default, Result: Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Affidavit of Service, Sub Type: Private Process, Result: Served

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2017
  • Events: Event Type: Notice, Sub Type: Dismissal for Lack of Service, Result: Mailed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/26/2017
  • Events: Event Type: Undesignated, Result: Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2018
  • Judgment For: SOUTHWEST FINANCE LLC Judgment Against: SPENCER STEWART, Amount: $500.00, Type: Principal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2018
  • Judgment For: SOUTHWEST FINANCE LLC Judgment Against: SPENCER STEWART, Amount: $342.83, Type: Interest

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2018
  • Judgment For: SOUTHWEST FINANCE LLC Judgment Against: SPENCER STEWART, Amount: $180.00, Type: Costs

    Read MoreRead Less