Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Maricopa County Justice Courts on 10/18/2019 at 20:59:19 (UTC).

Sherrie St Onge VS KIMBERLY VAN PELT

Case Summary

On 01/23/2017 Sherrie St Onge filed an Other lawsuit against KIMBERLY VAN PELT. This case was filed in Maricopa County Justice Courts, Encanto Justice Courthouse located in Maricopa, Arizona. The Judges overseeing this case are McMurry, C. Steven and Cheuvront, Ken. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********4635

  • Filing Date:

    01/23/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Maricopa County Justice Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Encanto Justice Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Maricopa, Arizona

Judge Details

Judges

McMurry, C. Steven

Cheuvront, Ken

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Sherrie St Onge

Defendant

KIMBERLY VAN PELT

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

JAMES CURRAN

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/03/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Judgment, Sub Type: For Plaintiff, Result: Judgment Entered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Notice, Sub Type: Court Date, Result: Mailed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Request, Sub Type: Undesignated, Result: Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2017
  • Events: Event Type: Pre-Trial Conference Report, Result: Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2017
  • Events: Event Type: Notice, Sub Type: Comprehensive Pre Trial Conf Hearing, Result: Mailed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2017
  • Events: Event Type: Notice, Sub Type: Comprehensive Pre Trial Conf Hearing, Result: Mailed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2017
  • Events: Event Type: Ruling on Motion, Sub Type: Continue Trial, Result: Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2017
  • Events: Event Type: Notice, Sub Type: Comprehensive Pre Trial Conf Hearing, Result: Mailed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2017
  • Events: Event Type: Ruling on Motion, Sub Type: Continue Trial, Result: Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2017
  • Events: Event Type: Motion, Sub Type: Continue Hearing, Result: Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2017
  • Events: Event Type: Ruling on Motion, Sub Type: Continue Hearing, Result: Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2017
  • Events: Event Type: Notice, Sub Type: Comprehensive Pre Trial Conf Hearing, Result: Mailed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2017
  • Events: Event Type: Request, Sub Type: For Hearing, Result: Filed by Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2017
  • Events: Event Type: Disclosure Statement, Sub Type: Notice of Service Re 26.1 Disclosure, Result: Filed by Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2017
  • Events: Event Type: Request, Sub Type: Transfer From Small Claims to Civil, Result: Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2017
  • Events: Event Type: Jury, Sub Type: Demand, Result: Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2017
  • Events: Event Type: Answer, Sub Type: Small Claims, Result: Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2017
  • Events: Event Type: Jury, Sub Type: Demand, Result: Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2017
  • Events: Event Type: Affidavit of Service, Sub Type: Certified/Registered Mail, Result: Received

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2018
  • Judgment For: SHERRIE St ONGE Judgment Against: Kimberly Van Pelt, Amount: $1,660.13, Type: Total Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less