This case was last updated from Maricopa County Justice Courts on 10/29/2019 at 08:16:33 (UTC).

SCHILLINGER DEVELOPMENT INC/RENTVEST ARIZONA VS CLAYTON WATSON Et Al

Case Summary

On 08/23/2017 SCHILLINGER DEVELOPMENT INC/RENTVEST ARIZONA filed an Other lawsuit against CLAYTON WATSON. This case was filed in Maricopa County Justice Courts, Maryvale Justice Courthouse located in Maricopa, Arizona. The Judge overseeing this case is Gastelum, Andy. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********7960

  • Filing Date:

    08/23/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Maricopa County Justice Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Maryvale Justice Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Maricopa, Arizona

Judge Details

Judge

Gastelum, Andy

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SCHILLINGER DEVELOPMENT INC/RENTVEST ARIZONA

Defendants

CLAYTON WATSON

CHANESA THOMAS WATSON

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Spencer Dickson

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/28/2017
  • Events: Event Type: Writ, Sub Type: Returned, Result: Served

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2017
  • Events: Event Type: Writ, Sub Type: Restitution, Result: Issued/Ordered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2017
  • Events: Event Type: Judgment, Sub Type: For Plaintiff, Result: Issued/Ordered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2017
  • Events: Event Type: Affidavit of Service, Sub Type: Private Process, Result: Served

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2017
  • Judgment For: SCHILLINGER DEVELOPMENT INC/RENTVEST ARIZONA Judgment Against: CHANESA THOMAS WATSON Judgment Against: CLAYTON WATSON, Amount: $1,427.96, Type: Total Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less