This case was last updated from Maricopa County Justice Courts on 07/28/2020 at 17:48:14 (UTC).

Salon Boutique VS Ashlee Marr

Case Summary

On 10/07/2019 Salon Boutique filed an Other lawsuit against Ashlee Marr. This case was filed in Maricopa County Justice Courts, Mcdowell Mountain Justice Court located in Maricopa, Arizona. The Judge overseeing this case is Reagan, Michele. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********4503

  • Filing Date:

    10/07/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Maricopa, Arizona

Judge Details

Judge

Reagan, Michele

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Salon Boutique

Defendant

Ashlee Marr

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Paul Levine

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/21/2020
  • HearingEvent: Default Hearing; Result: Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • HearingEvents: Event Type: Ruling on Motion, Sub Type: Appear Telephonically, Result: Denied

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • HearingEvents: Event Type: Motion, Sub Type: Appear Telephonically, Result: Filed by Plaintiff

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • HearingEvents: Event Type: Judgment, Sub Type: Default, Result: Issued/Ordered

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • HearingEvents: Event Type: Judgment, Sub Type: Default, Result: Issued/Ordered

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • JudgementJudgment For: Salon Boutique Judgment Against: Ashlee Marr, Amount: $3,720.00, Type: Principal

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • JudgementJudgment For: Salon Boutique Judgment Against: Ashlee Marr, Amount: $1,269.50, Type: Attorney Fee

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • JudgementJudgment For: Salon Boutique Judgment Against: Ashlee Marr, Amount: $401.00, Type: Costs

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/09/2020
  • HearingEvents: Event Type: Notice, Sub Type: Court Date, Result: Mailed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • HearingEvents: Event Type: Request, Sub Type: Affidavit for Entry of Default Judgment, Result: Filed by Plaintiff

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/03/2020
  • HearingEvents: Event Type: Request, Sub Type: Affidavit for Entry of Default Judgment, Result: Filed by Plaintiff

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/17/2019
  • HearingEvents: Event Type: Application for Entry of Default, Result: Filed by Plaintiff

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/20/2019
  • HearingEvents: Event Type: Affidavit of Service, Sub Type: Private Process, Result: Served

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/12/2019
  • HearingEvents: Event Type: Order, Sub Type: Alternative Service, Result: Issued/Ordered

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/05/2019
  • HearingEvents: Event Type: Motion, Sub Type: Alternative Service, Result: Filed by Plaintiff

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/12/2019
  • HearingEvents: Event Type: Affidavit of Service, Sub Type: Private Process, Result: Served

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less