This case was last updated from Maricopa County Justice Courts on 10/10/2019 at 15:14:13 (UTC).

RASOOL KADNAN KASLKOOL VS P J HUSSEY Et Al

Case Summary

On 04/21/2016 RASOOL KADNAN KASLKOOL filed an Other lawsuit against P J HUSSEY. This case was filed in Maricopa County Justice Courts, Encanto Justice Courthouse located in Maricopa, Arizona. The Judges overseeing this case are McMurry, C. Steven and Cheuvront, Ken. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********1905

  • Filing Date:

    04/21/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Maricopa County Justice Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Encanto Justice Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Maricopa, Arizona

Judge Details

Judges

McMurry, C. Steven

Cheuvront, Ken

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

RASOOL KADNAN KASLKOOL

Defendants

P J HUSSEY

ELLACIA MAXEY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

Andrew Hull

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/30/2016
  • Events: Event Type: Telephone Call, Result: Completed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2016
  • Events: Event Type: Judgment, Sub Type: For Defendant, Result: Mailed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2016
  • Events: Event Type: Ruling on Motion, Sub Type: Set Aside, Result: Signed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2016
  • Events: Event Type: Response, Sub Type: To Motion, Result: Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2016
  • Events: Event Type: Telephone Call, Result: Received

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2016
  • Events: Event Type: Response, Sub Type: To Motion, Result: Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2016
  • Events: Event Type: Ruling on Motion, Sub Type: Reconsideration, Result: Moot

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2016
  • Events: Event Type: Motion, Sub Type: Vacate, Result: Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2016
  • Events: Event Type: Judgment, Sub Type: Default, Result: Moot

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2016
  • Events: Event Type: Counsel, Sub Type: Application for Attorney Fees, Result: Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2016
  • Events: Event Type: Telephone Call, Result: Received

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2016
  • Events: Event Type: Response, Sub Type: To Motion, Result: Filed by Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2016
  • Events: Event Type: Order, Sub Type: Dismissal, Result: Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2016
  • Events: Event Type: Motion, Sub Type: Dismiss, Result: Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2016
  • Events: Event Type: Affidavit of Service, Sub Type: Private Process, Result: Served

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2016
  • Events: Event Type: Waiver of Service of Summons, Result: Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2016
  • Events: Event Type: Waiver/Deferral, Sub Type: Application for Waiver/Deferral, Result: Filed by Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2016
  • Judgment For: P J HUSSEY Judgment For: ELLACIA MAXEY Judgment Against: RASOOL KADNAN KASLKOOL, Amount: $325.00, Type: Attorney Fee

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2016
  • Judgment For: P J HUSSEY Judgment For: ELLACIA MAXEY Judgment Against: RASOOL KADNAN KASLKOOL, Amount: $65.00, Type: Costs

    Read MoreRead Less