This case was last updated from Maricopa County Justice Courts on 10/31/2019 at 23:45:51 (UTC).

RANCHWOOD VS ROBERT MARTINEZ

Case Summary

On 12/14/2017 RANCHWOOD filed an Other lawsuit against ROBERT MARTINEZ. This case was filed in Maricopa County Justice Courts, Maryvale Justice Courthouse located in Maricopa, Arizona. The Judge overseeing this case is Gastelum, Andy. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********6517

  • Filing Date:

    12/14/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Maricopa County Justice Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Maryvale Justice Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Maricopa, Arizona

Judge Details

Judge

Gastelum, Andy

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

RANCHWOOD

Defendant

ROBERT MARTINEZ

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Bradley Coleman

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/24/2019
  • Events: Event Type: Garnishment, Sub Type: Order Discharging Garnishee, Result: Order Signed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2019
  • Events: Event Type: Garnishment Creditor, Sub Type: Petition Discharging Garnishee, Result: Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2019
  • Events: Event Type: Satisfaction Of Judgment, Result: Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2019
  • Events: Event Type: Garnishment Creditor, Sub Type: Application for Order of Continuing Lien, Result: Order Signed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2019
  • Events: Event Type: Garnishment, Sub Type: Order of Continuing Lien, Result: Order Signed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2019
  • Events: Event Type: Motion, Sub Type: Vacate, Result: Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2019
  • Events: Event Type: Order, Sub Type: Vacate, Result: Order Signed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Affidavit of Service, Sub Type: OSC Return, Result: Served

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Order, Sub Type: Show Cause, Result: Order Signed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Garnishment Creditor, Sub Type: Petition for Order To Show Cause Re Default, Result: Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 03/02/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Garnishment, Sub Type: Order of Continuing Lien, Result: Issued/Ordered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Garnishment Creditor, Sub Type: Application for Order of Continuing Lien, Result: Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Garnishment Creditor, Sub Type: Application for Writ of Garnishment, Result: Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Garnishee, Sub Type: Answer, Result: Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Affidavit of Service, Sub Type: Garnishment Return, Result: Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Garnishment, Sub Type: Summons Issued, Result: Issued/Ordered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Garnishment Creditor, Sub Type: Application for Writ of Garnishment, Result: Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2017
  • Events: Event Type: Judgment, Sub Type: For Plaintiff, Result: Issued/Ordered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2017
  • Events: Event Type: Affidavit of Service, Sub Type: Private Process, Result: Served

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2017
  • Judgment For: RANCHWOOD Judgment Against: ROBERT MARTINEZ, Amount: $2,125.36, Type: Total Judgment, Status: Satisfied

    Read MoreRead Less