This case was last updated from Maricopa County Justice Courts on 10/31/2019 at 03:56:58 (UTC).

PROGRESSIVE ADVANCED INSURANCE COMPANY VS FULGENCIO TELLES Et Al

Case Summary

On 11/13/2017 PROGRESSIVE ADVANCED INSURANCE COMPANY filed an Other lawsuit against FULGENCIO TELLES. This case was filed in Maricopa County Justice Courts, Agua Fria Justice Courthouse located in Maricopa, Arizona. The Judge overseeing this case is Guzman, Joe. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********2729

  • Filing Date:

    11/13/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Maricopa County Justice Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Agua Fria Justice Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Maricopa, Arizona

Judge Details

Judge

Guzman, Joe

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PROGRESSIVE ADVANCED INSURANCE COMPANY

Defendants

FULGENCIO TELLES

CHRISTINA LORRAINE TELLES

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Matthew Hum

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/15/2019
  • Events: Event Type: Order, Sub Type: Dismiss Lack of Service, Result: Dismissed Without Prejudice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2019
  • Events: Event Type: Order, Sub Type: Extend Time for Service, Result: Denied

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2019
  • Events: Event Type: Motion, Sub Type: Extension of Time to Serve, Result: Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2019
  • Events: Event Type: Notice, Sub Type: Pending Dismissal of Lawsuit, Result: Mailed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2019
  • Events: Event Type: Order, Sub Type: Extend Time for Service, Result: Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2019
  • Events: Event Type: Motion, Sub Type: Extension of Time to Serve, Result: Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Order, Sub Type: Extend Time for Service, Result: Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Motion, Sub Type: Extension of Time to Serve, Result: Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Motion, Sub Type: Extension of Time to Serve, Result: Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Notice, Sub Type: Dismissal without Prejudice, Result: Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Order, Sub Type: Extend Time for Service, Result: Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Motion, Sub Type: Extension of Time to Serve, Result: Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2017
  • Events: Event Type: Affidavit of Service, Sub Type: Private Process, Result: Served

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2017
  • Events: Event Type: Notice, Sub Type: Dismissal for Lack of Service, Result: e-mailed

    Read MoreRead Less