This case was last updated from Maricopa County Justice Courts on 10/31/2019 at 06:23:18 (UTC).

PRIMUS HEALTHCARE LLC VS SOUTHWEST MEDICAL CENTER PLLC

Case Summary

On 11/15/2017 PRIMUS HEALTHCARE LLC filed an Other lawsuit against SOUTHWEST MEDICAL CENTER PLLC. This case was filed in Maricopa County Justice Courts, East Mesa Justice Courthouse located in Maricopa, Arizona. The Judge overseeing this case is Russell, Keith. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********5820

  • Filing Date:

    11/15/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Maricopa County Justice Courts

  • Courthouse:

    East Mesa Justice Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Maricopa, Arizona

Judge Details

Judge

Russell, Keith

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PRIMUS HEALTHCARE LLC

Defendants

SOUTHWEST MEDICAL CENTER PLLC

CHRISTOPHER LABBAN

SOUTHWEST MEDICAL CENTER, FAMILY MEDICINE, INJURY & SPORTS MEDICINE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Todd Gurstel

Defendant Attorney

Adam Anderson

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/09/2019
  • Events: Event Type: Counsel, Sub Type: Notice of Substitution, Result: Filed by Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Order, Sub Type: Undesignated, Result: Issued/Ordered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Order of Transfer, Sub Type: Superior Court (Exceeds Jurisdiction), Result: Issued/Ordered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Answer and Counterclaim, Result: Filed by Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Affidavit of Service, Sub Type: Acceptance of Service, Result: Filed by Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Proof of Debt, Result: Filed by Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Complaint, Sub Type: Amended Complaint, Result: Filed by Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Order, Sub Type: Undesignated, Result: Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2017
  • Events: Event Type: Motion, Sub Type: Amend Complaint, Result: Filed by Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2017
  • Events: Event Type: Affidavit of Service, Sub Type: Private Process, Result: Served

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2017
  • Events: Event Type: Proof of Debt, Result: Filed by Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.