This case was last updated from Maricopa County Justice Courts on 04/10/2021 at 08:41:48 (UTC).

PRESTO LOAN CENTERS LLC VS CHRIST DEMETRULIAS

Case Summary

On 03/13/2020 PRESTO LOAN CENTERS LLC filed an Other lawsuit against CHRIST DEMETRULIAS. This case was filed in Maricopa County Justice Courts, Mcdowell Mountain Justice Court located in Maricopa, Arizona. The Judge overseeing this case is Reagan, Michele. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********2182

  • Filing Date:

    03/13/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Maricopa, Arizona

Judge Details

Judge

Reagan, Michele

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PRESTO LOAN CENTERS LLC

Defendant

CHRIST DEMETRULIAS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Sanford Germaine

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/02/2021
  • HearingEvents: Event Type: Garnishment, Sub Type: Order of Continuing Lien, Result: Signed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/27/2021
  • HearingEvents: Event Type: Garnishment Creditor, Sub Type: Application for Order of Continuing Lien, Result: Filed by Plaintiff

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/19/2021
  • HearingEvents: Event Type: Garnishee, Sub Type: Answer (Earnings), Result: Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/15/2021
  • HearingEvents: Event Type: Affidavit of Service, Sub Type: Garnishment Return, Result: Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/31/2020
  • HearingEvents: Event Type: Writ, Sub Type: Garnishment Earnings, Result: Issued/Ordered

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/31/2020
  • HearingEvents: Event Type: Garnishment Creditor, Sub Type: Application for Writ of Garnishment, Result: Filed by Plaintiff

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/08/2020
  • HearingEvents: Event Type: Judgment, Sub Type: Default, Result: Judgment Entered

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/08/2020
  • JudgementJudgment For: PRESTO LOAN CENTERS LLC Judgment Against: CHRIST DEMETRULIAS, Amount: $6,763.36, Type: Principal

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/08/2020
  • JudgementJudgment For: PRESTO LOAN CENTERS LLC Judgment Against: CHRIST DEMETRULIAS, Amount: $3,020.63, Type: Interest

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/08/2020
  • JudgementJudgment For: PRESTO LOAN CENTERS LLC Judgment Against: CHRIST DEMETRULIAS, Amount: $2,450.00, Type: Attorney Fee

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/08/2020
  • JudgementJudgment For: PRESTO LOAN CENTERS LLC Judgment Against: CHRIST DEMETRULIAS, Amount: $163.00, Type: Costs

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/04/2020
  • HearingEvents: Event Type: Request, Sub Type: Affidavit for Entry of Default Judgment, Result: Filed by Plaintiff

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/17/2020
  • HearingEvents: Event Type: Application for Entry of Default, Result: Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/25/2020
  • HearingEvents: Event Type: Affidavit of Service, Sub Type: Private Process, Result: Served

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/25/2020
  • HearingEvents: Event Type: Affidavit of Service, Sub Type: Private Process, Result: Served

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less