Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Maricopa County Justice Courts on 10/28/2019 at 05:38:43 (UTC).

PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES LLC VS ROBERTO C CONDE

Case Summary

On 07/10/2017 PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES LLC filed an Other lawsuit against ROBERTO C CONDE. This case was filed in Maricopa County Justice Courts, East Mesa Justice Courthouse located in Maricopa, Arizona. The Judge overseeing this case is Russell, Keith. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********4537

  • Filing Date:

    07/10/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Maricopa County Justice Courts

  • Courthouse:

    East Mesa Justice Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Maricopa, Arizona

Judge Details

Judge

Russell, Keith

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES LLC

Defendant

ROBERTO C CONDE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Arika Hover

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/25/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Stipulation and Order of Judgment, Result: Filed by Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Judgment, Sub Type: Stipulated, Result: Judgment Entered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Disclosure Statement, Sub Type: JCRCP Rule 121, Result: Filed by Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Pre-Trial Conference Report, Result: Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2017
  • Events: Event Type: Notice, Sub Type: Comprehensive Pre Trial Conf Hearing, Result: Mailed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2017
  • Events: Event Type: Pre-Trial Conference Report, Result: Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2017
  • Events: Event Type: Disclosure Statement, Sub Type: JCRCP Rule 121, Result: Filed by Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2017
  • Events: Event Type: Notice, Sub Type: Dismissal for Lack of Service, Result: Mailed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2017
  • Events: Event Type: Notice, Sub Type: Comprehensive Pre Trial Conf Hearing, Result: Mailed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2017
  • Events: Event Type: Answer, Sub Type: Civil Complaint, Result: Filed by Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2017
  • Events: Event Type: Waiver/Deferral, Sub Type: Waiving Court Costs, Result: Issued/Ordered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2017
  • Events: Event Type: Waiver/Deferral, Sub Type: Application for Waiver/Deferral, Result: Filed by Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2018
  • Judgment For: PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES LLC Judgment Against: ROBERTO C CONDE, Amount: $9,623.23, Type: Principal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2018
  • Judgment For: PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES LLC Judgment Against: ROBERTO C CONDE, Amount: $221.00, Type: Costs

    Read MoreRead Less