This case was last updated from Maricopa County Justice Courts on 11/05/2019 at 08:13:43 (UTC).

Portfolio Recovery Associates LLC VS Nancy Drew

Case Summary

On 02/13/2018 Portfolio Recovery Associates LLC filed an Other lawsuit against Nancy Drew. This case was filed in Maricopa County Justice Courts, Desert Ridge Justice Courthouse located in Maricopa, Arizona. The Judge overseeing this case is Riggs, Cathy. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0285

  • Filing Date:

    02/13/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Maricopa County Justice Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Desert Ridge Justice Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Maricopa, Arizona

Judge Details

Judge

Riggs, Cathy

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Portfolio Recovery Associates LLC

Defendant

Nancy Drew

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Michael Chalhoub

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/19/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Notice, Sub Type: Dismissal With Prejudice, Result: Filed by Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Stipulation, Sub Type: Dismiss With Prejudice, Result: Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Appeal Notice of, Sub Type: Right to Appeal, Result: Completed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Motion, Sub Type: Appear Telephonically, Result: Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Disclosure Statement, Sub Type: JCRCP Rule 121, Result: Filed by Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Disclosure Statement, Sub Type: JCRCP Rule 121, Result: Filed by Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Motion, Sub Type: Appear Telephonically, Result: Filed by Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Disclosure Statement, Sub Type: JCRCP Rule 121, Result: Served

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Notice, Sub Type: Court Date, Result: Mailed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Mediation, Sub Type: Outcome Notice, Result: No Agreement

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Disclosure Statement, Sub Type: JCRCP Rule 121, Result: Filed by Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Order, Sub Type: Setting Mediation, Result: Mailed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Answer, Sub Type: Civil Complaint, Result: Filed by Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Affidavit of Service, Sub Type: Private Process, Result: Served

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.