This case was last updated from Maricopa County Justice Courts on 11/04/2019 at 08:41:30 (UTC).

PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC VS LIZBEHT ELIZALDE

Case Summary

On 01/05/2018 PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC filed an Other lawsuit against LIZBEHT ELIZALDE. This case was filed in Maricopa County Justice Courts, Downtown Justice Courthouse located in Maricopa, Arizona. The Judge overseeing this case is Medina, Enrique. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********3371

  • Filing Date:

    01/05/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Maricopa County Justice Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Downtown Justice Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Maricopa, Arizona

Judge Details

Judge

Medina, Enrique

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC

Defendant

LIZBEHT ELIZALDE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Rhett Flaming-Buschman

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/09/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Pre-Trial Conference Report, Result: Filed by Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Notice, Sub Type: Comprehensive Pre Trial Conf Hearing, Result: Mailed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Judgment, Sub Type: Pleadings, Result: Judgment Entered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Disclosure Statement, Sub Type: Notice of Service Re 26.1 Disclosure, Result: Filed by Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Document Received, Sub Type: Undesignated, Result: Filed by Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Counsel, Sub Type: Statement of Costs, Result: Filed by Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Motion, Sub Type: Judgment on Pleadings, Result: Filed by Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Application for Entry of Default, Result: Filed by Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Answer, Sub Type: Civil Complaint, Result: Filed by Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Notice, Sub Type: Dismissal for Lack of Service, Result: Mailed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Affidavit of Service, Sub Type: Private Process, Result: Served

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2018
  • Judgment For: PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC Judgment Against: LIZBEHT ELIZALDE, Amount: $1,145.94, Type: Principal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2018
  • Judgment For: PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC Judgment Against: LIZBEHT ELIZALDE, Amount: $162.00, Type: Costs

    Read MoreRead Less