Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Maricopa County Justice Courts on 10/11/2019 at 15:27:28 (UTC).

Portfolio Recovery Associates LLc VS Kristen J Dewitt-Lopez

Case Summary

On 05/18/2016 Portfolio Recovery Associates LLc filed an Other lawsuit against Kristen J Dewitt-Lopez. This case was filed in Maricopa County Justice Courts, Encanto Justice Courthouse located in Maricopa, Arizona. The Judges overseeing this case are McMurry, C. Steven and Cheuvront, Ken. The case status is Pending - Case Initiated.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********9370

  • Filing Date:

    05/18/2016

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Case Initiated

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Maricopa County Justice Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Encanto Justice Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Maricopa, Arizona

Judge Details

Judges

McMurry, C. Steven

Cheuvront, Ken

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Portfolio Recovery Associates LLc

PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC

Defendant

Kristen J Dewitt-Lopez

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

John Sheils

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/08/2019
  • Events: Event Type: Pre-Trial Conference Report, Result: Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2019
  • Events: Event Type: Notice, Sub Type: Comprehensive Pre Trial Conf Hearing, Result: Mailed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2019
  • Events: Event Type: Returned Mail, Sub Type: For Plaintiff, Result: Received

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2019
  • Events: Event Type: Notice, Sub Type: Comprehensive Pre Trial Conf Hearing, Result: Mailed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2017
  • Events: Event Type: Notice, Sub Type: Comprehensive Pre Trial Conf Hearing, Result: Mailed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2017
  • Events: Event Type: Order, Sub Type: Extend Time for Service, Result: Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2017
  • Events: Event Type: Motion, Sub Type: Extension of Time to Serve, Result: Filed by Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2017
  • Events: Event Type: Pre-Trial Conference Report, Result: Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2017
  • Events: Event Type: Notice, Sub Type: Comprehensive Pre Trial Conf Hearing, Result: Mailed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2017
  • Events: Event Type: Waiver/Deferral, Sub Type: Waiving Court Costs, Result: Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2017
  • Events: Event Type: Waiver/Deferral, Sub Type: Application for Waiver/Deferral, Result: Filed by Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2017
  • Events: Event Type: Answer, Sub Type: Civil Complaint, Result: Filed by Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2017
  • Events: Event Type: Application for Entry of Default, Result: Filed by Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2016
  • Events: Event Type: Affidavit of Service, Sub Type: Private Process, Result: Served

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2016
  • Events: Event Type: Notice, Sub Type: Undesignated, Result: Mailed

    Read MoreRead Less