This case was last updated from Maricopa County Justice Courts on 10/26/2020 at 09:57:59 (UTC).

PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC VS KARRI R WILLE

Case Summary

On 09/25/2020 PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC filed an Other lawsuit against KARRI R WILLE. This case was filed in Maricopa County Justice Courts, Agua Fria Justice Courthouse located in Maricopa, Arizona. The Judge overseeing this case is Guzman, Joe. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********7361

  • Filing Date:

    09/25/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Maricopa County Justice Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Agua Fria Justice Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Maricopa, Arizona

Judge Details

Judge

Guzman, Joe

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC

Defendant

KARRI R WILLE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Arika Hover

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/20/2020
  • HearingEvents: Event Type: Notice, Sub Type: Dismissal, Result: Dismissed Without Prejudice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2020
  • HearingEvents: Event Type: Affidavit of Service, Sub Type: Private Process, Result: Served

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2020
  • HearingEvents: Event Type: Notice, Sub Type: Dismissal for Lack of Service, Result: e-mailed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • HearingEvents: Event Type: Summons, Sub Type: Issued, Result: Issued/Ordered

    Read MoreRead Less