Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Maricopa County Justice Courts on 10/11/2019 at 11:56:16 (UTC).

PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES LLC VS ALICE J DUGAN

Case Summary

On 05/16/2016 PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES LLC filed an Other lawsuit against ALICE J DUGAN. This case was filed in Maricopa County Justice Courts, Dreamy Draw Justice Courthouse located in Maricopa, Arizona. The Judge overseeing this case is Conti, Frank. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********6874

  • Filing Date:

    05/16/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Maricopa County Justice Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Dreamy Draw Justice Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Maricopa, Arizona

Judge Details

Judge

Conti, Frank

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES LLC

Defendants

ALICE J DUGAN

KELLY DUGAN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Arika Hover

Defendant Attorney

Augustine Jimenez

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/25/2017
  • Events: Event Type: Order, Sub Type: Dismissal, Result: Dismissed Without Prejudice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2017
  • Events: Event Type: Stipulation, Sub Type: Dismiss, Result: Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2017
  • Events: Event Type: Joint ADR Statement, Sub Type: Settlement Reached, Result: Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2017
  • Events: Event Type: Order, Sub Type: Setting Mediation, Result: Mailed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2017
  • Events: Event Type: Answer, Sub Type: Cross-Claim, Result: Filed by Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2017
  • Events: Event Type: Affidavit of Service, Sub Type: Private Process, Result: Served

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2017
  • Events: Event Type: Answer, Sub Type: Cross-Claim, Result: Filed by Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2017
  • Events: Event Type: Ruling on Motion, Sub Type: Amend, Result: Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2017
  • Events: Event Type: Joint ADR Statement, Sub Type: Settlement Reached, Result: Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2017
  • Events: Event Type: Motion, Sub Type: Amend, Result: Filed by Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2017
  • Events: Event Type: Answer, Sub Type: Cross-Claim, Result: Filed by Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2017
  • Events: Event Type: Notice, Sub Type: Court Date, Result: Mailed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2017
  • Events: Event Type: Disclosure Statement, Sub Type: Notice of Service Re 26.1 Disclosure, Result: Filed by Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2017
  • Events: Event Type: Joint ADR Statement, Sub Type: No Settlement Reached, Result: Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2016
  • Events: Event Type: Order, Sub Type: Setting Mediation, Result: Mailed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2016
  • Events: Event Type: Answer, Sub Type: Civil Complaint, Result: Filed by Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2016
  • Events: Event Type: Application for Entry of Default, Result: Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2016
  • Events: Event Type: Affidavit of Service, Sub Type: Private Process, Result: Served

    Read MoreRead Less