This case was last updated from Maricopa County Justice Courts on 10/30/2019 at 10:01:09 (UTC).

PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES LLC VS ADRIAN R FELIX DE LA CRUZ

Case Summary

On 10/12/2017 PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES LLC filed an Other lawsuit against ADRIAN R FELIX DE LA CRUZ. This case was filed in Maricopa County Justice Courts, East Mesa Justice Courthouse located in Maricopa, Arizona. The Judge overseeing this case is Russell, Keith. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********1707

  • Filing Date:

    10/12/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Maricopa County Justice Courts

  • Courthouse:

    East Mesa Justice Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Maricopa, Arizona

Judge Details

Judge

Russell, Keith

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES LLC

Defendants

ADRIAN R FELIX DE LA CRUZ

DENISE A FELIX

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Arika Hover

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/02/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Disclosure Statement, Sub Type: Notice of Service Re 26.1 Disclosure, Result: Filed by Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Judgment, Sub Type: Pleadings, Result: Judgment Entered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2017
  • Events: Event Type: Statement of Costs, Result: Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2017
  • Events: Event Type: Proof of Debt, Result: Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2017
  • Events: Event Type: Motion, Sub Type: Judgment on Pleadings, Result: Filed by Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2017
  • Events: Event Type: Pre-Trial Conference Report, Result: Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2017
  • Events: Event Type: Notice, Sub Type: Comprehensive Pre Trial Conf Hearing, Result: Mailed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2017
  • Events: Event Type: Answer, Sub Type: Civil Complaint, Result: Filed by Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2017
  • Events: Event Type: Affidavit of Service, Sub Type: Private Process, Result: Received

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2017
  • Events: Event Type: Affidavit of Service, Sub Type: Private Process, Result: Served

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2018
  • Judgment For: PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES LLC Judgment Against: ADRIAN R FELIX DE LA CRUZ Judgment Against: DENISE A FELIX, Amount: $4,908.09, Type: Principal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2018
  • Judgment For: PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES LLC Judgment Against: ADRIAN R FELIX DE LA CRUZ Judgment Against: DENISE A FELIX, Amount: $222.00, Type: Costs

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.