This case was last updated from Maricopa County Justice Courts on 01/10/2019 at 22:36:55 (UTC).

PINNACLE PEAK ESTATES UNIT THREE HOA VS GERALDINE PINTO

Case Summary

On 02/14/2018 PINNACLE PEAK ESTATES UNIT THREE HOA filed an Other lawsuit against GERALDINE PINTO. This case was filed in Maricopa County Justice Courts, Desert Ridge Justice Courthouse located in Maricopa, Arizona. The Judge overseeing this case is Riggs, Cathy. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********1562

  • Filing Date:

    02/14/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Maricopa County Justice Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Desert Ridge Justice Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Maricopa, Arizona

Judge Details

Judge

Riggs, Cathy

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PINNACLE PEAK ESTATES UNIT THREE HOA

Defendant

GERALDINE PINTO

Garnishee

Johnson Bank

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Christina Morgan

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/29/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Satisfaction Of Judgment, Result: Filed by Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Garnishment, Sub Type: Judgment Against Garnishee, Result: Signed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Garnishee, Sub Type: Answer (Non-Earnings), Result: Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Affidavit of Service, Sub Type: Private Process, Result: Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Writ, Sub Type: Garnishment Non-Earnings, Result: Issued/Ordered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Judgment, Sub Type: Default, Result: Signed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Statement of Costs, Result: Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Affidavit in Support of Attorney Fees, Result: Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Notice, Sub Type: Undesignated, Result: Filed by Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Application for Entry of Default, Result: Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Affidavit of Service, Sub Type: Private Process, Result: Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2018
  • Judgment For: PINNACLE PEAK ESTATES UNIT THREE HOA Judgment Against: GERALDINE PINTO, Amount: $800.66, Type: Principal, Status: Satisfied

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2018
  • Judgment For: PINNACLE PEAK ESTATES UNIT THREE HOA Judgment Against: GERALDINE PINTO, Amount: $660.00, Type: Attorney Fee, Status: Satisfied

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2018
  • Judgment For: PINNACLE PEAK ESTATES UNIT THREE HOA Judgment Against: GERALDINE PINTO, Amount: $160.64, Type: Costs, Status: Satisfied

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.