This case was last updated from Maricopa County Justice Courts on 10/31/2019 at 20:44:10 (UTC).

PHOENIX TITLE LOANS, LLC VS ERIN STEVEE JOHNSON

Case Summary

On 12/08/2017 PHOENIX TITLE LOANS, LLC filed an Other lawsuit against ERIN STEVEE JOHNSON. This case was filed in Maricopa County Justice Courts, Downtown Justice Courthouse located in Maricopa, Arizona. The Judge overseeing this case is Medina, Enrique. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********2960

  • Filing Date:

    12/08/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Maricopa County Justice Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Downtown Justice Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Maricopa, Arizona

Judge Details

Judge

Medina, Enrique

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PHOENIX TITLE LOANS, LLC

Defendant

ERIN STEVEE JOHNSON

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/11/2019
  • Events: Event Type: Order, Sub Type: Undesignated, Result: Moot

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2019
  • Events: Event Type: Motion, Sub Type: Reconsideration, Result: Filed by Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2019
  • Events: Event Type: Corrective Action Notice Sent, Result: Mailed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2019
  • Events: Event Type: Application for Entry of Default, Result: Moot

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2019
  • Events: Event Type: Order, Sub Type: Undesignated, Result: Denied

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2019
  • Events: Event Type: Motion, Sub Type: Undesignated, Result: Filed by Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Motion, Sub Type: Extension of Time to Serve, Result: Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2019
  • Events: Event Type: Order, Sub Type: Dismissal, Result: Dismissed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Ruling on Motion, Sub Type: Extension of Time to Serve, Result: Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Motion, Sub Type: Alternative Service, Result: Filed by Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Motion, Sub Type: Vacate, Result: Filed by Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Notice, Sub Type: Dismissal for Lack of Service, Result: Mailed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Motion, Sub Type: Alternative Service, Result: Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2017
  • Events: Event Type: Summons, Sub Type: Issued, Result: Issued/Ordered

    Read MoreRead Less