This case was last updated from Maricopa County Justice Courts on 11/01/2019 at 04:35:34 (UTC).

PHOENIX TITLE LOANS, LLC VS CHRISTOPHER J MILLER

Case Summary

On 12/20/2017 PHOENIX TITLE LOANS, LLC filed an Other lawsuit against CHRISTOPHER J MILLER. This case was filed in Maricopa County Justice Courts, Downtown Justice Courthouse located in Maricopa, Arizona. The Judge overseeing this case is Medina, Enrique. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********2574

  • Filing Date:

    12/20/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Maricopa County Justice Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Downtown Justice Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Maricopa, Arizona

Judge Details

Judge

Medina, Enrique

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PHOENIX TITLE LOANS, LLC

Defendant

CHRISTOPHER J MILLER

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/04/2019
  • Events: Event Type: Garnishment, Sub Type: Order of Continuing Lien, Result: Issued/Ordered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2019
  • Events: Event Type: Garnishment Creditor, Sub Type: Certificate of Service, Result: Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Garnishment Creditor, Sub Type: Application for Order of Continuing Lien, Result: Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Garnishment, Sub Type: And Order, Result: No Action

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Request, Sub Type: Post Storage Hearing, Result: Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Garnishment, Sub Type: Notice of Hearing on Garnishment, Result: Issued/Ordered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Garnishee, Sub Type: Answer (Earnings), Result: Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Garnishment Creditor, Sub Type: Application for Writ of Garnishment, Result: Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Writ, Sub Type: Garnishment Earnings, Result: Issued/Ordered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Corrective Action Notice Sent, Result: Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 06/06/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Judgment, Sub Type: Default, Result: Default Judgment And Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Document Received, Sub Type: Undesignated, Result: Filed by Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Judgment, Sub Type: Default, Result: Denied

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Request, Sub Type: Affidavit for Entry of Default Judgment, Result: Filed by Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Application for Entry of Default, Result: Filed by Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Affidavit of Service, Sub Type: Private Process, Result: Served

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2017
  • Events: Event Type: Notice, Sub Type: Dismissal for Lack of Service, Result: Mailed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2018
  • Judgment For: PHOENIX TITLE LOANS, LLC Judgment Against: CHRISTOPHER J MILLER, Amount: $4,778.42, Type: Principal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2018
  • Judgment For: PHOENIX TITLE LOANS, LLC Judgment Against: CHRISTOPHER J MILLER, Amount: $2,038.20, Type: Interest

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2018
  • Judgment For: PHOENIX TITLE LOANS, LLC Judgment Against: CHRISTOPHER J MILLER, Amount: $162.00, Type: Costs

    Read MoreRead Less