This case was last updated from Maricopa County Justice Courts on 04/10/2021 at 23:38:28 (UTC).

PHOENIX NORTHWEST PROPERTY OWNER LLC VS JOSEPH MIRANDA Et Al

Case Summary

On 04/24/2020 PHOENIX NORTHWEST PROPERTY OWNER LLC filed an Other lawsuit against JOSEPH MIRANDA. This case was filed in Maricopa County Justice Courts, West Mcdowell Justice Court located in Maricopa, Arizona. The Judge overseeing this case is Ramirez Lopez, Teresa. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0003

  • Filing Date:

    04/24/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Maricopa, Arizona

Judge Details

Judge

Ramirez Lopez, Teresa

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PHOENIX NORTHWEST PROPERTY OWNER LLC

Defendants

VANESSA MARTIZEZ

JOSEPH MIRANDA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Scott Clark

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/02/2020
  • HearingEvents: Event Type: Returned Mail, Sub Type: For Defendant, Result: Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/02/2020
  • HearingEvents: Event Type: Returned Mail, Sub Type: For Defendant, Result: Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/18/2020
  • HearingEvents: Event Type: Writ, Sub Type: Restitution, Result: Served

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/17/2020
  • HearingEvents: Event Type: Returned Mail, Sub Type: For Defendant, Result: Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/06/2020
  • HearingEvent: Oral Argument; Result: Granted

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/06/2020
  • HearingEvents: Event Type: Ruling on Motion, Sub Type: Undesignated, Result: Issued/Ordered

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/03/2020
  • HearingEvents: Event Type: Affidavit of Service, Sub Type: Post/Mail, Result: Served

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/31/2020
  • HearingEvents: Event Type: Notice, Sub Type: Court Date, Result: Completed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/30/2020
  • HearingEvents: Event Type: Motion, Sub Type: Compel, Result: Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/07/2020
  • HearingEvents: Event Type: Writ, Sub Type: Restitution, Result: Issued/Ordered

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/30/2020
  • HearingEvent: Eviction Action Hearing; Result: Judgment Entered

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/30/2020
  • HearingEvents: Event Type: Judgment, Sub Type: Court, Result: Issued/Ordered

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/30/2020
  • JudgementJudgment For: PHOENIX NORTHWEST PROPERTY OWNER LLC Judgment Against: JOSEPH MIRANDA Judgment Against: VANESSA MARTIZEZ, Amount: $952.00, Type: Rent

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/30/2020
  • JudgementJudgment For: PHOENIX NORTHWEST PROPERTY OWNER LLC Judgment Against: JOSEPH MIRANDA Judgment Against: VANESSA MARTIZEZ, Amount: $56.00, Type: Late Charge

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/30/2020
  • JudgementJudgment For: PHOENIX NORTHWEST PROPERTY OWNER LLC Judgment Against: JOSEPH MIRANDA Judgment Against: VANESSA MARTIZEZ, Amount: $106.00, Type: Costs

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/30/2020
  • JudgementJudgment For: PHOENIX NORTHWEST PROPERTY OWNER LLC Judgment Against: JOSEPH MIRANDA Judgment Against: VANESSA MARTIZEZ, Amount: $125.00, Type: Attorney Fee

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/24/2020
  • HearingEvents: Event Type: Affidavit of Service, Sub Type: Post/Mail, Result: Served

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less