This case was last updated from Maricopa County Justice Courts on 01/15/2023 at 12:50:25 (UTC).

Philip Ernsberger VS Penelope Mooney

Case Summary

On 10/02/2020 Philip Ernsberger filed an Other lawsuit against Penelope Mooney. This case was filed in Maricopa County Justice Courts, Encanto Justice Court located in Maricopa, Arizona. The Judge overseeing this case is Cheuvront, Ken. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0578

  • Filing Date:

    10/02/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Maricopa, Arizona

Judge Details

Judge

Cheuvront, Ken

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Philip Ernsberger

Defendant

Penelope Mooney

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/26/2022
  • HearingEvent Type: Appeal Certificate of Abandonment; Result: Issued/Ordered

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/17/2021
  • Judgement(F)or / (A)gainst: Judgement For: Philip Ernsberger; Judgement Against: Penelope Mooney; Amount: $632.11; Type: Total Judgment

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/27/2021
  • HearingEvent Type: Corrective Action Notice Sent; Result: Mailed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/27/2021
  • HearingEvent Type: Judgment; Sub Type: Amended; Result: Signed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/20/2021
  • HearingEvent Type: Notice; Sub Type: Undesignated; Result: Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/30/2021
  • HearingEvent Type: Judgment; Sub Type: Undesignated; Result: Signed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/30/2021
  • Judgement(F)or / (A)gainst: Judgement For: Philip Ernsberger; Judgement Against: Penelope Mooney; Amount: $632.11; Type: Attorney Fee

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/26/2021
  • HearingEvent Type: Accounting; Sub Type: Undesignated; Result: Completed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/26/2021
  • HearingEvent Type: Accounting; Sub Type: Undesignated; Result: Completed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/26/2021
  • HearingEvent Type: Accounting; Sub Type: Undesignated; Result: Completed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
21 More Docket Entries
  • 10/12/2020
  • HearingEvent Type: Appeal Notice of; Sub Type: Appeal; Result: Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/12/2020
  • HearingEvent Type: Appellant; Sub Type: Designation of Record; Result: Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/12/2020
  • HearingEvent Type: Appeal Notice of; Sub Type: Appeal; Result: Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/09/2020
  • HearingEvent Type: Ruling on Motion; Sub Type: Set Aside; Result: Denied

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/08/2020
  • HearingEvent: Eviction Action Hearing; Result: Judgment

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/08/2020
  • HearingEvent Type: Undesignated; Result: Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/08/2020
  • HearingEvent Type: Motion; Sub Type: Set Aside; Result: Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/08/2020
  • HearingEvent Type: Judgment; Sub Type: Default; Result: Order Signed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/08/2020
  • Judgement(F)or / (A)gainst: Judgement For: Philip Ernsberger; Judgement Against: Penelope Mooney; Amount: $1,955.00; Type: Total Judgment

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/02/2020
  • HearingEvent Type: Affidavit of Service; Sub Type: Private Process; Result: Served

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less