This case was last updated from Maricopa County Justice Courts on 07/07/2020 at 13:58:25 (UTC).

Patio 15 Arizona Sun LP VS Nelson Vasquez

Case Summary

On 05/28/2020 Patio 15 Arizona Sun LP filed an Other lawsuit against Nelson Vasquez. This case was filed in Maricopa County Justice Courts, Encanto Justice Courthouse located in Maricopa, Arizona. The Judge overseeing this case is Cheuvront, Ken. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********7306

  • Filing Date:

    05/28/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Maricopa County Justice Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Encanto Justice Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Maricopa, Arizona

Judge Details

Judge

Cheuvront, Ken

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Patio 15 Arizona Sun LP

Defendant

Nelson Vasquez

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Andrew Hull

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/16/2020
  • HearingEvents: Event Type: Writ, Sub Type: Restitution, Result: Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2020
  • HearingEvents: Event Type: Writ, Sub Type: Restitution, Result: Order Signed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2020
  • HearingEvent: Eviction Action Hearing; Result: Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2020
  • HearingEvents: Event Type: Judgment, Sub Type: Default, Result: Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2020
  • JudgementJudgment For: Patio 15 Arizona Sun LP Judgment Against: Nelson Vasquez, Amount: $4,154.80, Type: Total Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2020
  • HearingEvents: Event Type: Affidavit of Service, Sub Type: Post/Mail, Result: Served

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2020
  • HearingEvents: Event Type: Summons, Sub Type: Issued, Result: Issued/Ordered

    Read MoreRead Less