Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Maricopa County Justice Courts on 11/05/2019 at 01:07:20 (UTC).

PARKSIDE MESA LLC VS SABRINA SMITH

Case Summary

On 01/31/2018 PARKSIDE MESA LLC filed an Other lawsuit against SABRINA SMITH. This case was filed in Maricopa County Justice Courts, North Mesa Justice Courthouse located in Maricopa, Arizona. The Judge overseeing this case is Ash, Cecil. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********2105

  • Filing Date:

    01/31/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Maricopa County Justice Courts

  • Courthouse:

    North Mesa Justice Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Maricopa, Arizona

Judge Details

Judge

Ash, Cecil

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

PARKSIDE MESA LLC

COLLECTIONS USA INC

Defendant

SABRINA SMITH

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Teresa Hunt

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/19/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Garnishment, Sub Type: Order of Continuing Lien, Result: Issued/Ordered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Garnishment Creditor, Sub Type: Application for Order of Continuing Lien, Result: Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Affidavit of Service, Sub Type: Garnishment Return, Result: Served

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Garnishee, Sub Type: Answer (Earnings), Result: Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Notice, Sub Type: Assignment of Judgment, Result: Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Statement of Costs, Result: Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Counsel, Sub Type: Notice of Appearance, Result: Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Garnishment Creditor, Sub Type: Application for Writ of Garnishment, Result: Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Writ, Sub Type: Garnishment Earnings, Result: Issued/Ordered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Imaged Case File, Result: Completed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Affidavit of Service, Sub Type: Private Process, Result: Served

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2018
  • Judgment For: PARKSIDE MESA LLC Judgment Against: SABRINA SMITH, Amount: $2,323.00, Type: Total Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less