This case was last updated from Maricopa County Justice Courts on 07/08/2020 at 12:51:09 (UTC).

PARDON COMPANY INC VS JOSHUA MICHAEL HARSTICK

Case Summary

On 05/29/2020 PARDON COMPANY INC filed an Other lawsuit against JOSHUA MICHAEL HARSTICK. This case was filed in Maricopa County Justice Courts, North Mesa Justice Courthouse located in Maricopa, Arizona. The Judge overseeing this case is Jones, Kyle. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********7817

  • Filing Date:

    05/29/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Maricopa County Justice Courts

  • Courthouse:

    North Mesa Justice Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Maricopa, Arizona

Judge Details

Judge

Jones, Kyle

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PARDON COMPANY INC

Defendant

JOSHUA MICHAEL HARSTICK

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Scott Williams

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/16/2020
  • HearingEvents: Event Type: Motion, Sub Type: Vacate & Dismiss, Result: Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2020
  • HearingEvents: Event Type: Order, Sub Type: Vacate & Dismiss, Result: Issued/Ordered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2020
  • HearingEvent: Eviction Action Hearing; Result: Default Judgment And Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2020
  • HearingEvents: Event Type: Imaged Case File, Result: Completed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2020
  • Judgement, Status: Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2020
  • HearingEvents: Event Type: Affidavit of Service, Sub Type: Post/Mail, Result: Served

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.