Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Maricopa County Justice Courts on 10/10/2019 at 03:03:45 (UTC).

OUTFRONT MEDIA LLC VS Andrew Simmons

Case Summary

On 04/05/2016 OUTFRONT MEDIA LLC filed an Other lawsuit against Andrew Simmons. This case was filed in Maricopa County Justice Courts, Encanto Justice Courthouse located in Maricopa, Arizona. The Judges overseeing this case are McMurry, C. Steven and Cheuvront, Ken. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0973

  • Filing Date:

    04/05/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Maricopa County Justice Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Encanto Justice Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Maricopa, Arizona

Judge Details

Judges

McMurry, C. Steven

Cheuvront, Ken

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

OUTFRONT MEDIA LLC

Defendant

Andrew Simmons

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Claudio Iannitelli

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/10/2017
  • Events: Event Type: Judgment, Sub Type: Default, Result: Judgment Entered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2017
  • Events: Event Type: Corrective Action Notice Sent, Result: Mailed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2017
  • Events: Event Type: Corrective Action Notice Sent, Result: Mailed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2017
  • Events: Event Type: Judgment, Sub Type: Default, Result: Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2016
  • Events: Event Type: Reply, Sub Type: To Response, Result: Filed by Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2016
  • Events: Event Type: Notice, Sub Type: Comprehensive Pre Trial Conf Hearing, Result: Mailed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2016
  • Events: Event Type: Request, Sub Type: Affidavit for Entry of Default Judgment, Result: Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2016
  • Events: Event Type: Judgment, Sub Type: Default, Result: Moot

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2016
  • Events: Event Type: Counterclaim, Sub Type: Against Plaintiff(s), Result: Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2016
  • Events: Event Type: Answer, Sub Type: Civil Complaint, Result: Filed by Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2016
  • Events: Event Type: Application for Entry of Default, Result: Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2016
  • Events: Event Type: Affidavit of Service, Sub Type: Private Process, Result: Served

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2017
  • Events: Event Type: Pre-Trial Conference Report, Result: Completed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2017
  • Judgment For: OUTFRONT MEDIA LLC Judgment Against: Andrew Simmons, Amount: $850.00, Type: Attorney Fee

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2017
  • Judgment For: OUTFRONT MEDIA LLC Judgment Against: Andrew Simmons, Amount: $267.40, Type: Costs

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2017
  • Judgment For: OUTFRONT MEDIA LLC Judgment Against: Andrew Simmons, Amount: $5,000.00, Type: Principal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2017
  • Judgment For: OUTFRONT MEDIA LLC Judgment Against: Andrew Simmons, Amount: $1,055.03, Type: Interest

    Read MoreRead Less