This case was last updated from Maricopa County Justice Courts on 10/28/2019 at 11:23:06 (UTC).

OBERON LLC VS Mary Elizabeth Thinnes Et Al

Case Summary

On 07/18/2017 OBERON LLC filed an Other lawsuit against Mary Elizabeth Thinnes. This case was filed in Maricopa County Justice Courts, Downtown Justice Courthouse located in Maricopa, Arizona. The Judges overseeing this case are Hernandez, Jimmie and Medina, Enrique. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********1194

  • Filing Date:

    07/18/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Maricopa County Justice Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Downtown Justice Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Maricopa, Arizona

Judge Details

Judges

Hernandez, Jimmie

Medina, Enrique

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

OBERON LLC

Defendants

Mary Elizabeth Thinnes

Earnest Miller

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Scott Clark

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/06/2019
  • Events: Event Type: Order, Sub Type: Undesignated, Result: Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2019
  • Events: Event Type: Notice, Sub Type: Court Date, Result: Hearing Set

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2019
  • Events: Event Type: Document Received, Sub Type: Undesignated, Result: Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2019
  • Events: Event Type: Document Received, Sub Type: Undesignated, Result: Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2019
  • Events: Event Type: Document Received, Sub Type: Undesignated, Result: Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2019
  • Events: Event Type: Document Received, Sub Type: Undesignated, Result: Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2019
  • Events: Event Type: Ruling on Motion, Sub Type: Set Aside, Result: Denied

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2019
  • Events: Event Type: Motion, Sub Type: Set Aside, Result: Filed by Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2017
  • Events: Event Type: Judgment, Sub Type: Default, Result: Judgment Entered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2017
  • Events: Event Type: Affidavit of Service, Sub Type: Post/Mail, Result: Served

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2017
  • Judgment For: OBERON LLC Judgment Against: Mary Elizabeth Thinnes Judgment Against: Earnest Miller, Amount: $710.99, Type: Rent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2017
  • Judgment For: OBERON LLC Judgment Against: Mary Elizabeth Thinnes Judgment Against: Earnest Miller, Amount: $150.00, Type: Late Charge

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2017
  • Judgment For: OBERON LLC Judgment Against: Mary Elizabeth Thinnes Judgment Against: Earnest Miller, Amount: $50.00, Type: Undesignated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2017
  • Judgment For: OBERON LLC Judgment Against: Mary Elizabeth Thinnes Judgment Against: Earnest Miller, Amount: $95.00, Type: Costs

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2017
  • Judgment For: OBERON LLC Judgment Against: Mary Elizabeth Thinnes Judgment Against: Earnest Miller, Amount: $90.00, Type: Attorney Fee

    Read MoreRead Less