This case was last updated from Maricopa County Justice Courts on 10/27/2020 at 09:10:29 (UTC).

NORTON CIRCLE APARTMENT HOMES VS ALIZE VARGAS

Case Summary

On 09/25/2020 NORTON CIRCLE APARTMENT HOMES filed an Other lawsuit against ALIZE VARGAS. This case was filed in Maricopa County Justice Courts, Agua Fria Justice Courthouse located in Maricopa, Arizona. The Judge overseeing this case is Guzman, Joe. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********7201

  • Filing Date:

    09/25/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Maricopa County Justice Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Agua Fria Justice Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Maricopa, Arizona

Judge Details

Judge

Guzman, Joe

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

NORTON CIRCLE APARTMENT HOMES

Defendant

ALIZE VARGAS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Andrew Hull

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/02/2020
  • HearingEvents: Event Type: Writ, Sub Type: Restitution, Result: Served

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2020
  • HearingEvents: Event Type: Writ, Sub Type: Restitution, Result: Signed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2020
  • HearingEvent: Eviction Action Hearing; Result: Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2020
  • HearingEvents: Event Type: Judgment, Sub Type: For Plaintiff, Result: Signed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2020
  • JudgementJudgment For: NORTON CIRCLE APARTMENT HOMES Judgment Against: ALIZE VARGAS, Amount: $390.39, Type: Total Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2020
  • HearingEvents: Event Type: Document Received, Sub Type: Undesignated, Result: Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • HearingEvents: Event Type: Affidavit of Service, Sub Type: Private Process, Result: Served

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • HearingEvents: Event Type: Summons, Sub Type: Issued, Result: Issued/Ordered

    Read MoreRead Less