This case was last updated from Maricopa County Justice Courts on 10/29/2019 at 07:42:26 (UTC).

NORTHERN GARDEN APARTMENTS LLC VS MALIK RASHEED ABDULLAH

Case Summary

On 08/23/2017 NORTHERN GARDEN APARTMENTS LLC filed an Other lawsuit against MALIK RASHEED ABDULLAH. This case was filed in Maricopa County Justice Courts, Moon Valley Justice Courthouse located in Maricopa, Arizona. The Judge overseeing this case is Hettinger, Andrew. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********7384

  • Filing Date:

    08/23/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Maricopa County Justice Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Moon Valley Justice Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Maricopa, Arizona

Judge Details

Judge

Hettinger, Andrew

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

NORTHERN GARDEN APARTMENTS LLC

Defendant

MALIK RASHEED ABDULLAH

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Scott Clark

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/07/2017
  • Events: Event Type: Writ, Sub Type: Restitution, Result: Issued/Ordered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2017
  • Events: Event Type: Judgment, Sub Type: Default, Result: Issued/Ordered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2017
  • Events: Event Type: Affidavit of Service, Sub Type: Post/Mail, Result: Served

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2017
  • Events: Event Type: Writ, Sub Type: Restitution, Result: Served

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2017
  • Judgment For: NORTHERN GARDEN APARTMENTS LLC Judgment Against: MALIK RASHEED ABDULLAH, Amount: $1,116.16, Type: Total Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less