Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Maricopa County Justice Courts on 04/11/2021 at 14:13:36 (UTC).

NICHOLAS J LEIER VS SHAWN QUANNIE HORACE

Case Summary

On 05/28/2020 NICHOLAS J LEIER filed an Other lawsuit against SHAWN QUANNIE HORACE. This case was filed in Maricopa County Justice Courts, North Mesa Justice Courthouse located in Maricopa, Arizona. The Judge overseeing this case is Jones, Kyle. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********7393

  • Filing Date:

    05/28/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Maricopa County Justice Courts

  • Courthouse:

    North Mesa Justice Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Maricopa, Arizona

Judge Details

Judge

Jones, Kyle

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

NICHOLAS J LEIER

Defendant

SHAWN QUANNIE HORACE

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/28/2020
  • HearingEvents: Event Type: Judgment, Sub Type: Default, Result: Issued/Ordered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2020
  • JudgementJudgment For: NICHOLAS J LEIER Judgment Against: SHAWN QUANNIE HORACE, Amount: $2,000.00, Type: Principal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2020
  • JudgementJudgment For: NICHOLAS J LEIER Judgment Against: SHAWN QUANNIE HORACE, Amount: $53.00, Type: Costs

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2020
  • HearingEvents: Event Type: Request, Sub Type: Affidavit for Entry of Default Judgment, Result: Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2020
  • HearingEvents: Event Type: Corrective Action Notice Sent, Result: Mailed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2020
  • HearingEvents: Event Type: Application for Entry of Default, Result: Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2020
  • HearingEvents: Event Type: Notice, Sub Type: Pending Dismissal of Lawsuit, Result: Mailed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2020
  • HearingEvents: Event Type: Affidavit of Service, Sub Type: Private Process, Result: Served

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2020
  • HearingEvents: Event Type: Complaint, Sub Type: Small Claims, Result: Filed

    Read MoreRead Less