This case was last updated from Maricopa County Justice Courts on 10/29/2019 at 07:40:05 (UTC).

N/A Sage Stone 81 LP VS DeRon Holden

Case Summary

On 08/23/2017 N/A Sage Stone 81 LP filed an Other lawsuit against DeRon Holden. This case was filed in Maricopa County Justice Courts, Arrowhead Justice Courthouse located in Maricopa, Arizona. The Judge overseeing this case is Wismer, Craig. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********7333

  • Filing Date:

    08/23/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Maricopa County Justice Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Arrowhead Justice Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Maricopa, Arizona

Judge Details

Judge

Wismer, Craig

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

N/A Sage Stone 81 LP

Defendant

DeRon Holden

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Scott Clark

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/07/2017
  • Events: Event Type: Writ, Sub Type: Restitution, Result: Returned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2017
  • Events: Event Type: Writ, Sub Type: Restitution, Result: Issued/Ordered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2017
  • Events: Event Type: Judgment, Sub Type: Default, Result: Signed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2017
  • Events: Event Type: Affidavit of Service, Sub Type: Alternative Method of Service, Result: Summons Returned Served

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2017
  • Judgment For: N/A Sage Stone 81 LP Judgment Against: DeRon Holden, Amount: $2,523.33, Type: Total Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less