Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Maricopa County Justice Courts on 10/11/2019 at 07:56:39 (UTC).

MSW Capital LLC VS Nicholas Balboa

Case Summary

On 05/10/2016 MSW Capital LLC filed an Other lawsuit against Nicholas Balboa. This case was filed in Maricopa County Justice Courts, Desert Ridge Justice Courthouse located in Maricopa, Arizona. The Judges overseeing this case are Jayne, Clancy and Riggs, Cathy. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********2808

  • Filing Date:

    05/10/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Maricopa County Justice Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Desert Ridge Justice Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Maricopa, Arizona

Judge Details

Judges

Jayne, Clancy

Riggs, Cathy

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MSW Capital LLC

Defendant

Nicholas Balboa

Garnishees

SYMANTEC CORPORATION

CT CORPORATION SYSTEM

CHASE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Dominic Verstegen

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/30/2019
  • Events: Event Type: Garnishment, Sub Type: Release & Quash Writ, Result: Signed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2019
  • Events: Event Type: Garnishee, Sub Type: Answer (Earnings), Result: Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2019
  • Events: Event Type: Affidavit of Service, Sub Type: Post/Mail, Result: Served

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2019
  • Events: Event Type: Garnishment Creditor, Sub Type: Application for Writ of Garnishment, Result: Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2019
  • Events: Event Type: Garnishment, Sub Type: Satisfaction against Garnishee, Result: Filed by Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Garnishment Creditor, Sub Type: Application Judgment Against Garnishee, Result: Filed by Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Garnishment, Sub Type: Judgment Against Garnishee, Result: Issued/Ordered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Ruling on Motion, Sub Type: Set Aside, Result: Default Judgment And Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Response, Sub Type: To Motion, Result: Filed by Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Waiver/Deferral, Sub Type: Application for Waiver/Deferral, Result: Issued/Ordered

    Read MoreRead Less
8 More Docket Entries
  • 04/09/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Garnishment, Sub Type: Release & Quash Writ, Result: Issued/Ordered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Garnishment Creditor, Sub Type: Certificate of Service, Result: Served

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Garnishee, Sub Type: Answer, Result: Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Garnishment Creditor, Sub Type: Application for Writ of Garnishment, Result: Filed by Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2016
  • Events: Event Type: Statement of Costs, Result: Filed by Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2016
  • Events: Event Type: Judgment, Sub Type: Default, Result: Signed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2016
  • Events: Event Type: Application for Entry of Default, Result: Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2016
  • Events: Event Type: Affidavit of Service, Sub Type: Private Process, Result: Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2016
  • Judgment For: MSW Capital LLC Judgment Against: Nicholas Balboa, Amount: $1,411.37, Type: Principal, Status: Satisfied

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2016
  • Judgment For: MSW Capital LLC Judgment Against: Nicholas Balboa, Amount: $146.00, Type: Costs, Status: Satisfied

    Read MoreRead Less