This case was last updated from Maricopa County Justice Courts on 10/08/2019 at 21:33:01 (UTC).

MIDLAND FUNDING, LLC VS Samuel Martinez

Case Summary

On 03/03/2016 MIDLAND FUNDING, LLC filed an Other lawsuit against Samuel Martinez. This case was filed in Maricopa County Justice Courts, Encanto Justice Courthouse located in Maricopa, Arizona. The Judges overseeing this case are McMurry, C. Steven and Cheuvront, Ken. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0477

  • Filing Date:

    03/03/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Maricopa County Justice Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Encanto Justice Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Maricopa, Arizona

Judge Details

Judges

McMurry, C. Steven

Cheuvront, Ken

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MIDLAND FUNDING, LLC

Defendant

Samuel Martinez

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Michael Johnson

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/15/2017
  • Events: Event Type: Garnishment, Sub Type: Release & Quash Writ, Result: Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2017
  • Events: Event Type: Garnishment, Sub Type: Order of Continuing Lien, Result: Signed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2017
  • Events: Event Type: Garnishee, Sub Type: Answer, Result: Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2017
  • Events: Event Type: Garnishee, Sub Type: Answer, Result: Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2017
  • Events: Event Type: Affidavit of Service, Sub Type: Garnishment Return, Result: Served

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2016
  • Events: Event Type: Garnishment Creditor, Sub Type: Application for Writ of Garnishment, Result: Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2016
  • Events: Event Type: Garnishment Creditor, Sub Type: Application for Writ of Garnishment, Result: Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2016
  • Events: Event Type: Judgment, Sub Type: Default, Result: Judgment Entered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2016
  • Events: Event Type: Request, Sub Type: Affidavit for Entry of Default Judgment, Result: Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2016
  • Events: Event Type: Application for Entry of Default, Result: Filed by Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2016
  • Events: Event Type: Affidavit of Service, Sub Type: Private Process, Result: Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2016
  • Judgment For: MIDLAND FUNDING, LLC Judgment Against: Samuel Martinez, Amount: $851.04, Type: Principal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2016
  • Judgment For: MIDLAND FUNDING, LLC Judgment Against: Samuel Martinez, Amount: $146.00, Type: Costs

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2016
  • Judgment For: MIDLAND FUNDING, LLC Judgment Against: Samuel Martinez, Amount: $51.04, Type: Offset

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2016
  • Judgment For: MIDLAND FUNDING, LLC Judgment Against: Samuel Martinez, Amount: $946.00, Type: Interest

    Read MoreRead Less