Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Maricopa County Justice Courts on 10/16/2019 at 20:38:39 (UTC).

MIDLAND FUNDING LLC VS SAMANTHA HIGGINS

Case Summary

On 11/18/2016 MIDLAND FUNDING LLC filed an Other lawsuit against SAMANTHA HIGGINS. This case was filed in Maricopa County Justice Courts, Dreamy Draw Justice Courthouse located in Maricopa, Arizona. The Judge overseeing this case is Conti, Frank. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0182

  • Filing Date:

    11/18/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Maricopa County Justice Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Dreamy Draw Justice Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Maricopa, Arizona

Judge Details

Judge

Conti, Frank

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MIDLAND FUNDING LLC

Defendant

SAMANTHA HIGGINS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Shannon Crane

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/16/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Undesignated, Result: Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Garnishment Creditor, Sub Type: Petition Discharging Garnishee, Result: Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Notice, Sub Type: Filing of Bankruptcy, Result: Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Garnishment, Sub Type: Order of Continuing Lien, Result: Signed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2017
  • Events: Event Type: Counsel, Sub Type: Statement of Costs, Result: Filed by Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2017
  • Events: Event Type: Garnishment Creditor, Sub Type: Application for Order of Continuing Lien, Result: Filed by Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2017
  • Events: Event Type: Garnishee, Sub Type: Answer, Result: Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2017
  • Events: Event Type: Affidavit of Service, Sub Type: Garnishment Return, Result: Served

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2017
  • Events: Event Type: Garnishment Creditor, Sub Type: Application for Writ of Garnishment, Result: Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2017
  • Events: Event Type: Judgment, Sub Type: Default, Result: Order Signed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2017
  • Events: Event Type: Statement of Costs, Result: Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2017
  • Events: Event Type: Request, Sub Type: Affidavit for Entry of Default Judgment, Result: Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2017
  • Events: Event Type: Application for Entry of Default, Result: Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2016
  • Events: Event Type: Affidavit of Service, Sub Type: Private Process, Result: Served

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2017
  • Judgment For: MIDLAND FUNDING LLC Judgment Against: SAMANTHA HIGGINS, Amount: $1,784.60, Type: Principal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2017
  • Judgment For: MIDLAND FUNDING LLC Judgment Against: SAMANTHA HIGGINS, Amount: $149.00, Type: Costs

    Read MoreRead Less