This case was last updated from Maricopa County Justice Courts on 10/30/2019 at 19:07:24 (UTC).

MIDLAND FUNDING LLC VS SAMANTHA GORAL

Case Summary

On 10/24/2017 MIDLAND FUNDING LLC filed an Other lawsuit against SAMANTHA GORAL. This case was filed in Maricopa County Justice Courts, North Valley Justice Courthouse located in Maricopa, Arizona. The Judge overseeing this case is Williams, Gerald. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********1790

  • Filing Date:

    10/24/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Maricopa County Justice Courts

  • Courthouse:

    North Valley Justice Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Maricopa, Arizona

Judge Details

Judge

Williams, Gerald

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MIDLAND FUNDING LLC

Defendant

SAMANTHA GORAL

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Brandon Holub

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/17/2019
  • Events: Event Type: Subpoena duces tecum, Result: Issued/Ordered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2019
  • Events: Event Type: Release Of Garnishee, Result: Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2019
  • Events: Event Type: Garnishee, Sub Type: Answer (Non-Earnings), Result: Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2019
  • Events: Event Type: Affidavit of Service, Sub Type: Garnishment Return, Result: Served

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2019
  • Events: Event Type: Garnishment Creditor, Sub Type: Application for Writ of Garnishment, Result: Issued/Ordered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2019
  • Events: Event Type: Statement of Costs, Result: Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Garnishment, Sub Type: Release & Quash Writ, Result: Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Garnishee, Sub Type: Answer (Earnings), Result: Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Affidavit of Service, Sub Type: Garnishment Return, Result: Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Statement of Costs, Result: Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 06/12/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Statement of Costs, Result: Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Garnishment Creditor, Sub Type: Application for Writ of Garnishment, Result: Issued/Ordered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Judgment, Sub Type: Default, Result: Judgment Entered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Statement of Costs, Result: Filed by Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Request, Sub Type: Affidavit for Entry of Default Judgment, Result: Filed by Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2017
  • Events: Event Type: Application for Entry of Default, Result: Issued/Ordered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2017
  • Events: Event Type: Corrective Action Notice Sent, Result: Mailed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2017
  • Events: Event Type: Affidavit of Service, Sub Type: Private Process, Result: Served

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2018
  • Judgment For: MIDLAND FUNDING LLC Judgment Against: SAMANTHA GORAL, Amount: $581.73, Type: Principal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2018
  • Judgment For: MIDLAND FUNDING LLC Judgment Against: SAMANTHA GORAL, Amount: $143.50, Type: Costs

    Read MoreRead Less