Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Maricopa County Justice Courts on 10/08/2019 at 21:22:56 (UTC).

MIDLAND FUNDING LLC VS MEGAN BUTLER

Case Summary

On 03/03/2016 MIDLAND FUNDING LLC filed an Other lawsuit against MEGAN BUTLER. This case was filed in Maricopa County Justice Courts, Dreamy Draw Justice Courthouse located in Maricopa, Arizona. The Judge overseeing this case is Conti, Frank. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0273

  • Filing Date:

    03/03/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Maricopa County Justice Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Dreamy Draw Justice Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Maricopa, Arizona

Judge Details

Judge

Conti, Frank

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MIDLAND FUNDING LLC

Defendant

MEGAN BUTLER

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Michael Johnson

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/06/2019
  • Events: Event Type: Satisfaction Of Judgment, Result: Filed by Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2019
  • Events: Event Type: Garnishment, Sub Type: Release & Quash Writ, Result: Filed by Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2019
  • Events: Event Type: Letter, Result: Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2019
  • Events: Event Type: Garnishment, Sub Type: Order of Continuing Lien, Result: Issued/Ordered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2019
  • Events: Event Type: Garnishment Creditor, Sub Type: Application for Order of Continuing Lien, Result: Filed by Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Garnishee, Sub Type: Answer (Earnings), Result: Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Affidavit of Service, Sub Type: Garnishment Return, Result: Served

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Garnishment Creditor, Sub Type: Application for Writ of Garnishment, Result: Filed by Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2016
  • Events: Event Type: Judgment, Sub Type: Default, Result: Accepted/Signed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2016
  • Events: Event Type: Request, Sub Type: Affidavit for Entry of Default Judgment, Result: Filed by Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2016
  • Events: Event Type: Application for Entry of Default, Result: Filed by Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2016
  • Events: Event Type: Affidavit of Service, Sub Type: Private Process, Result: Served

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2016
  • Judgment For: MIDLAND FUNDING LLC Judgment Against: MEGAN BUTLER, Amount: $1,875.68, Type: Total Judgment, Status: Satisfied

    Read MoreRead Less